Branches (1)
Reports for Klarer Fenster AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Klarer Fenster AG
- Klarer Fenster AG in St. Gallen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods». Klarer Fenster AG is active.
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 14.05.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-102.036.676.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Auto Klarer AG, KF Holding AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1925
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.008.250-2
UID/VAT
CHE-102.036.676
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung und Vertrieb von Glaser- und Schreinerarbeiten aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KEEL + PARTNER AG | St. Gallen | 08.04.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Mettler Fenster AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Klarer Fenster AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006031625, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Klarer Fenster AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.036.676, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2023, Publ. 1005805396).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klarer, Rafael, von Appenzell, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in St. Gallen].
Publication number: HR02-1005805396, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Klarer Fenster AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.036.676, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2019, Publ. 1004571981).
Zweigniederlassung neu:
Wil (SG) (CHE-468.330.501).
Publication number: HR02-1004571981, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Klarer Fenster AG, in St. Gallen, CHE-102.036.676, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2014, S.0, Publ. 1493723).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Klarer, Ludwig, von Appenzell, in Abtwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Klarer-Knechtle, Klara, von Appenzell, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Klarer, Josef, von Appenzell, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Klarer, Josef jun., Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Klarer, Adrian, von Appenzell, in Engelburg (Gaiserwald), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Klarer, Rafael, von Appenzell, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.