Reports for Kieswerk Fieschertal AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kieswerk Fieschertal AG
- Kieswerk Fieschertal AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Fieschertal. Kieswerk Fieschertal AG belongs to the industry «Mining of stones and earth» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 17.03.1970.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 18.10.2019.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-103.960.670.
Management (4)
newest board members
Martin Volken,
Franz Josef Volken,
Manfred Volken,
Stephan Volken
newest authorized signatories
Martin Volken,
Franz Josef Volken,
Manfred Volken,
Stephan Volken
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.03.1970
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fieschertal
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.000.367-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.960.670
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausbeutung und Verkauf von Sand und Kies, Aufbereitung und Verkauf von Fertigbeton und von Zementartikeln.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Widar Treuhand AG | Brig-Glis | 28.12.1995 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kieswerk Fieschertal AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004741008, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Kieswerk Fieschertal AG, in Fieschertal, CHE-103.960.670, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 28.12.1995, S.7027).
Domizil neu:
Fieschertalstrasse 2, 3984 Fieschertal.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Volken, Franz Josef, von Fiesch, in Fiesch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit einem Mitglied [bisher: Volken, Franz-Josef, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Volken, Martin, von Fiesch, in Naters, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Volken, Manfred, von Fiesch, in Bitsch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten;
Volken, Stephan, von Fiesch, in Bitsch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten.
Commercial Registry Office Valais
Kieswerk Fieschertal AG, in Fieschertal (SHAB Nr.167 vom 29.8.1989, S.3587).Revisionsstelle: Widar Treuhand AG, in Brig-Glis.
Commercial Registry Office Valais
Kieswerk Fieschertal AG, in Fieschertal (SHAB Nr.157 vom 9.7.1984, S.2463). Das Büro der Geschäftsführung bei Theophil Venetz, 3983 Mörel, besteht nicht mehr. Franz Volken, einziges Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, schreibt sich nun Franz Josef Volken.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.