Reports for KIBAG Kies Seewen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KIBAG Kies Seewen AG
- KIBAG Kies Seewen AG with its legal headquarters in Seewen SZ is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Mining of stones and earth». KIBAG Kies Seewen AG is active.
- KIBAG Kies Seewen AG was founded on 23.07.1973.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 09.04.2024.
- The company KIBAG Kies Seewen AG is registered under the UID CHE-105.844.980.
Management (16)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Deborah Sarah Renggli,
Thomas Steiner,
Peter Rohner,
Marc André Rohr,
André Roland Bircher
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.07.1973
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schwyz
Commercial Registry Office
SZ
Commercial register number
CH-130.0.000.630-7
UID/VAT
CHE-105.844.980
Sector
Mining of stones and earth
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb von Steinbrüchen sowie die Produktion und der Vertrieb von Baustoffen aller Art, insbesondere von Hartschotter, Splitt, Kies und Beton; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen und Grundeigentum erwerben und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Intercontrol AG | Zürich | 25.05.2004 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | <2004 | 24.05.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- KIBAG Kies Seewen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KIBAG Kies Seewen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006004179, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
KIBAG Kies Seewen AG, in Schwyz, CHE-105.844.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 16.02.2024, Publ. 1005963126).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steiner, Thomas, von Schwyz, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien];
Renggli, Deborah Sarah, von Entlebuch, in Ebikon, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005963126, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
KIBAG Kies Seewen AG, in Schwyz, CHE-105.844.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 81 vom 27.04.2023, Publ. 1005733398).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rrmoku, Ajet, von Luzern, in Luzern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rohner, Peter, von Rebstein, in Dielsdorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005733398, Commercial Registry Office Schwyz, (130)
KIBAG Kies Seewen AG, in Schwyz, CHE-105.844.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 05.04.2023, Publ. 1005717727).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rrmoku, Ajet, von Luzern, in Luzern, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.