Head office
Other branches (3)
Reports for KHG Holzbau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KHG Holzbau AG
- KHG Holzbau AG with its legal headquarters in Uzwil is active. KHG Holzbau AG operates in the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods».
- There are 0 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 01.04.2011.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-265.589.102.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.04.2006
Legal form
Branch with head office in Switzerland
Legal headquarters of the company
Uzwil
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.9.059.164-4
UID/VAT
CHE-265.589.102
CHE-112.776.591 VAT
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Holzbauarbeiten aller Art und aller damit zusammenhängenden Arbeiten und Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Tochtergesellschaften gründen und erwerben sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, überbauen und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KHG Holzbau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 6103232, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
KHG Holzbau AG, in Uzwil, CH-320.9.059.164-4, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 01.02.2010, S. 15, Publ. 5469962).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Flawil.
Domizil neu:
Obere Waldhofstrasse 24, 9240 Uzwil.
Publication number: 5469962, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
KHG Holzbau AG, in Uzwil, CH-320.9.059.164-4, Zweigniederlassung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 13.04.2006, S. 11, Publ. 3334004).
mit Hauptsitz in:
Flawil.
Neue Identifikationsnummer Hauptsitz:
CH-320.3.058.882-0.
Registrierung Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Handelsregisterangabe des Hauptsitzes aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Zweck Hauptsitz neu:
[Gestrichene Zweckangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Angaben zur Zweigniederlassung neu:
[Gestrichene Personenangaben aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 110 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spornberger, Rolf, von Flawil und Egnach, in Degersheim, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fuchs Auf der Maur, Jennifer, von Einsiedeln, in Flawil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüegg, Martin, von St. Gallenkappel, in Wolfertswil (Degersheim), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Spornberger, Rosmarie, von Flawil und Egnach, in Degersheim, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lauener, Andreas, von Lauterbrunnen, in Niederglatt SG (Oberuzwil), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Züst, Peter, von Buch am Irchel, in Uzwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 3334004, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
KHG Holzbau AG, in Uzwil, CH-320.9.059.164-4, Hafnergasse 6, 9240 Uzwil, Zweigniederlassung (Neueintragung).
Firma Hauptsitz:
KHG Holzbau AG.
Rechtsform Hauptsitz:
Aktiengesellschaft.
Hauptsitz:
Flawil.
Handelsregistereintragung Hauptsitz:
20.02.2006 [letzte Publikation: siehe TB-Nr. 2682 vom 07.04.2006].
Zweck Hauptsitz:
Ausführung von Holzbauarbeiten aller Art und aller damit zusammenhängenden Arbeiten und Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Tochtergesellschaften gründen und erwerben sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, belasten, überbauen und veräussern.
Eingetragene Personen:
Spornberger, Rolf, von Flawil und Egnach, in Degersheim, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Fuchs Auf der Maur, Jennifer, von Einsiedeln, in Flawil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rüegg, Martin, von St. Gallenkappel, in Wolfertswil (Degersheim), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Spornberger, Rosmarie, von Flawil und Egnach, in Degersheim, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lauener, Andreas, von Lauterbrunnen, in Niederglatt SG (Oberuzwil), mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Züst, Peter, von Buch am Irchel, in Uzwil, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.