Address
Prättigauerstrasse 32
7265 Davos Wolfgang
Reports for Kessler Betriebe AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kessler Betriebe AG
- Kessler Betriebe AG in Davos Wolfgang is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses». Kessler Betriebe AG is active.
- The management of the company Kessler Betriebe AG consists of 3 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 02.11.2010.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 22.11.2023.
- The reported UID is CHE-116.162.821.
Management (3)
newest board members
Nino Kessler-Berry,
Rolf Kessler-Stiffler,
Thomas Rochat-Brägger
newest authorized signatories
Nino Kessler-Berry,
Rolf Kessler-Stiffler,
Thomas Rochat-Brägger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.11.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Davos
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-350.3.010.971-1
UID/VAT
CHE-116.162.821
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Führen von Hotel-, Restaurant- und Transportbetrieben sowie Handel mit Heizöl und anderen Brennstoffen; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Center AG | Chur | 22.11.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
D+M Treuhand und Beratung GmbH | Chur | 08.11.2010 | 21.11.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kessler Betriebe AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005891215, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Kessler Betriebe AG, in Davos, CHE-116.162.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2019, Publ. 1004769214).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
D+M Treuhand und Beratung GmbH (CHE-110.198.660), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand Center AG (CHE-112.589.528), in Chur, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004769214, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Kessler Betriebe AG, in Davos, CHE-116.162.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2017, Publ. 3293905).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler-Huber, Heinz, von Davos und Schiers, in Davos Wolfgang (Davos), Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kessler-Berry, Nino, von Davos, in Davos, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 3293905, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Kessler Betriebe AG, in Davos, CHE-116.162.821, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 25.11.2013, Publ. 1199145).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kessler-Rösselet, Wolfgang, von Davos und Schiers, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rochat-Kessler, Jean-Pierre, von L'Abbaye, in Davos, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.