Address
c/o Bank Vontobel AG
Schweizerhofquai 3a
6002 Luzern
Reports for Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung
- Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung with its legal headquarters in Luzern is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung is active.
- The management of the organization Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung, which was founded on the 11.11.2009, consists of 8 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 06.10.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung is registered under the UID CHE-115.200.778.
- Bank Vontobel AG, Dr. Ernst-Günther Bröder Stiftung are registered at the same address.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Matthias Thomas Ebneter,
Prof. Dr. Kerstin Carolin Martina Windhövel,
Felix Hauber,
Patrick Häsler
newest authorized signatories
Matthias Thomas Ebneter,
Martin Werner Gugler,
Céline Bergmann,
Prof. Dr. Kerstin Carolin Martina Windhövel,
Felix Hauber
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.11.2009
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Luzern
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.066.160-4
UID/VAT
CHE-115.200.778
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung der ausserobligatorischen beruflichen Vorsorge gemäss Artikel 1e BVV2 zugunsten ihrer Versicherten und deren Hinterbliebenen für die Risiken Alter, Invalidität und Tod.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Grant Thornton AG | Zürich | 17.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Agilis 1e Fondation collective
- Agilis 1e Fondazione collettiva
- Agilis 1e Collective Foundation
- Katharinen Pensionskasse II
- Pensionskasse II der Firma Wegelin & Co. Privatbankiers, Gesellschafter Bruderer, Hummler, Tolle & Co.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005854370, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-115.200.778, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 08.02.2023, Publ. 1005672821).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baumgartner, Benjamin Alexander, von Weiach, in Rüschlikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Joos, Raphael Stephan Maria, von Flims, in Adliswil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ebneter, Matthias Thomas, von Appenzell, in Altendorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005672821, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-115.200.778, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2022, Publ. 1005513759).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gugler, Martin, von St. Silvester, in Dietikon, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005513759, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Agilis 1e Sammelstiftung, in Luzern, CHE-115.200.778, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2022, Publ. 1005415530).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Togni, Karin, von Cevio, in Küsnacht (ZH), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grant Thornton AG (CHE-107.841.337), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Grant Thornton Bankrevision AG (CHE-107.841.337)];
Bergmann, Céline, von Meikirch, in Dübendorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.