Address
c/o Fiduciaire Rutz-Menger Sàrl
Rue de l'Hôpital 3
2520 La Neuveville
Reports for KANMAS SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout KANMAS SA
- KANMAS SA has its legal headquarters in La Neuveville and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading with various goods».
- KANMAS SA has 3 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 22.08.2019. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company KANMAS SA is registered under the UID CHE-116.108.141.
- On the same address as KANMAS SA there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: A&A Bijoux Swiss Sàrl, Fiduciaire Rutz-Menger Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.10.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
La Neuveville
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.048.896-4
UID/VAT
CHE-116.108.141
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but: commerce en tous genres, importation et exportation de matières industrielles, barres d'acier et machines-outils, ainsi que tout service s'y rattachant. Elle peut prendre ou gérer des participations dans toutes entreprises, créer toutes succursales.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- KANMAS AG
- KANMAS LTD
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: KANMAS SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004700356, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KANMAS SA, à La Neuveville, CHE-116.108.141, société anonyme (No. FOSC 208 du 26.10.2010, p.2, Publ. 5867680).
Nouvelle adresse:
c/o Fiduciaire Rutz-Menger Sàrl, Rue de l'Hôpital 3, 2520 La Neuveville.
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Shehab, Mohamed Monir, de Trub, à New Cairo, Helwan (EG), président, avec signature individuelle.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Halawa, Hisham, ressortissant égyptien, à Cairo (EG), président du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: à El-Shorouk, Helwan (EG), vice-président, avec signature individuelle];
Shehab, Karim, de Trub, à Cairo (EG), membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 5867680, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
KANMAS SA (KANMAS AG) (KANMAS LTD), à La Neuveville, CH-036.3.048.896-4, c/o Sylvia Shehab-Thalmann, chemin des Prés-Guëtins 49, 2520 La Neuveville, société anonyme (nouvelle inscription).
Date des statuts:
12.10.2010.
But:
La société a pour but: commerce en tous genres, importation et exportation de matières industrielles, barres d'acier et machines-outils, ainsi que tout service s'y rattachant. Elle peut prendre ou gérer des participations dans toutes entreprises, créer toutes succursales.
Capital-actions:
CHF 250'000.00.
Capital-actions libéré:
CHF 50'000.00.
Actions:
500 actions nominatives de CHF 500.00.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communications aux actionnaires:
si le conseil d'administration connaît l'adresse de tous les actionnaires, les communications peuvent être faites par lettre, télécopie ou courriel. Selon déclaration des fondateurs du 12.10.2010, la société n'est pas soumise au contrôle ordinaire et renonce au contrôle restreint.
Personne(s) inscrite(s):
Shehab, Mohamed Monir, de Trub, à New Cairo, Helwan (EG), président, avec signature individuelle;
Halawa, Hisham, ressortissant égyptien, à El-Shorouk, Helwan (EG), vice-président, avec signature individuelle;
Shehab-Thalmann, Sylvia, de Trub, à La Neuveville, secrétaire, avec signature individuelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.