Reports for Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH
- Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH is active in the industry «Other construction» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Widnau.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The company was founded on 21.08.2012.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 03.02.2023.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of SG is CHE-131.404.090.
- There are 2 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Köppel-Vogel AG, Köppel-Vogel Grundbau AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.08.2012
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Widnau
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.072.012-8
UID/VAT
CHE-131.404.090
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Montage und Sanierung von Kaminen, Isolierungen in den Bereichen Wärme, Kälte, Schall sowie Branddämmungen; die Gesellschaft kann beliebig weitere Geschäftszweige angliedern und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen, Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005669502, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH, in Widnau, CHE-131.404.090, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 117 vom 19.06.2020, Publ. 1004915229).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Baurenhas, Astrid, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Alberschwende (AT), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baurenhas, Jan, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Alberschwende (AT), Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1004915229, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH, in Widnau, CHE-131.404.090, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 24.08.2012, S.0, Publ. 6822228).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kamin- & Isolierservice Baurenhas GmbH (FN 496067 k), in Alberschwende (AT), Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Baurenhas, Helmut, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Alberschwende (AT), Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: 6822228, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Kamin- & Isolierservice GmbH, in Widnau, CH-320.4.072.012-8, Neugasse 13, 9443 Widnau, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
16.08.2012.
Zweck:
Montage und Sanierung von Kaminen, Isolierungen in den Bereichen Wärme, Kälte, Schall sowie Branddämmungen;
die Gesellschaft kann beliebig weitere Geschäftszweige angliedern und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder solche übernehmen, Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, Grundstücke und Liegenschaften erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Stammkapital:
CHF 20'000.00. Nebenleistungspflichten, Vorhand-, Vorkaufs- oder Kaufsrechte gemäss näherer Umschreibung in den Statuten.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Geschäftsführung an die Gesellschafter erfolgen schriftlich oder per E-Mail. Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 16.08.2012 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Baurenhas, Helmut, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Alberschwende (AT), Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Baurenhas, Astrid, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Alberschwende (AT), Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hartmann, Silvio, von Wittenbach, in Diepoldsau, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.