Address
Kaffeeweltstrasse 10
4626 Niederbuchsiten
Reports for JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG
- JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG is active in the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Niederbuchsiten.
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 19.07.2023.
- The company's UID is CHE-405.926.906.
- Next to the company JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG there are 6 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Henzirohs-Studer AG, JURA Elektroapparate AG, Jura Henzirohs Holding AG.
Management (9)
newest board members
Kristina Probst,
Simon Probst,
Hans Jörg Stöckli,
Emanuel Probst,
Rainer Senn
newest authorized signatories
Hans Jörg Stöckli,
Roger Sturzenegger,
Emanuel Probst,
Marianne Probst-Müller,
Thomas Fournier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.11.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Niederbuchsiten
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.010.483-4
UID/VAT
CHE-405.926.906
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen irgendwelcher Art an Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes, insbesondere in den Bereichen JURA Kaffeemaschinen. Kann Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Solothurn | 09.11.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005799065, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG, in Niederbuchsiten, CHE-405.926.906, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 07.07.2021, Publ. 1005242480).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Probst, Kristina, von Oberbuchsiten, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Probst, Simon, von Oberbuchsiten, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005242480, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG, in Niederbuchsiten, CHE-405.926.906, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 25.02.2020, Publ. 1004838199).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grossrieder, Marius, von Bösingen, in Ittigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004838199, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
JURA Kaffeemaschinen Holding AG, in Niederbuchsiten, CHE-405.926.906, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2011, S.0, Publ. 6409334).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imbach, Martin, von Ruswil, in Halten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stöckli, Hans Jörg, von Aristau, in Subingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sturzenegger, Roger, von Altstätten, in Zollikon, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.