Reports for JS Handels AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout JS Handels AG
- JS Handels AG with its legal headquarters in Sempach is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». JS Handels AG is active.
- The company was founded on 07.05.2018.
- The last commercial register change was made on 30.12.2022. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- JS Handels AG is registered in the Canton of LU under the UID CHE-225.221.050.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.05.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sempach
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.805.744-5
UID/VAT
CHE-225.221.050
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Erzeugnissen der Heizungs-, Solar-, Kälte-, Klima-, Lüftungs-, Energie- und Sanitärtechnik und mit anderen Industrieerzeugnissen und deren Vertretung sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in diesen Bereichen; Erwerb, Verwertung, Belastung oder Veräusserung von Liegenschaften sowie Immaterialgüterrechten; Beteiligungen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: JS Handels AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005642484, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
JS Handels AG, in Wauwil, CHE-225.221.050, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 8 vom 14.01.2020, Publ. 1004803751).
Statutenänderung:
20.12.2022.
Sitz neu:
Sempach.
Domizil neu:
Büelhalde 23, 6204 Sempach.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief oder E-Mail. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.]
Publication number: HR02-1004803751, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
JS Handels AG, in Wauwil, CHE-225.221.050, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 11.05.2018, Publ. 4223109).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Swoboda, Stefan Gerold, von Wolhusen, in Dagmersellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Steinmann, Josua, von Sursee, in Sempach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Knutwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 4223109, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
JS Handels AG, in Wauwil, CHE-225.221.050, Kreuzmatt 8, 6242 Wauwil, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
01.05.2018.
Zweck:
Handel mit Erzeugnissen der Heizungs-, Solar-, Kälte-, Klima-, Lüftungs-, Energie- und Sanitärtechnik und mit anderen Industrieerzeugnissen und deren Vertretung sowie Erbringung von Dienstleistungen in diesen Bereichen;
Erwerb, Verwertung, Belastung oder Veräusserung von Liegenschaften sowie Immaterialgüterrechten;
Beteiligungen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 50'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen erfolgen durch Brief.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung der Gründer vom 01.05.2018 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Eingetragene Personen:
Steinmann, Josua, von Sursee, in Knutwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Swoboda, Stefan Gerold, von Wolhusen, in Dagmersellen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.