Reports for Jean Chiavazza SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jean Chiavazza SA
- Jean Chiavazza SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in St-Prex. Jean Chiavazza SA belongs to the industry «General structural engineering» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 05.07.1929 and has 4 persons in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 04.10.2021.
- Jean Chiavazza SA is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-101.513.969.
- On the same address as Jean Chiavazza SA there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: RB Consulting Borserini, SG Invest SA.
Management (4)
newest board members
Vincent Pierre Milliet,
Aurélia Chiavazza,
Sandrine Chiavazza,
Marie Chiavazza
newest authorized signatories
Vincent Pierre Milliet,
Aurélia Chiavazza,
Sandrine Chiavazza,
Marie Chiavazza
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.1929
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Prex
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.132.980-7
UID/VAT
CHE-101.513.969
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'une entreprise de bâtiments et travaux publics, fabrication et vente de tous matériaux de construction et la continuation de la maison "Jean Chiavazza", entreprise de bâtiments et travaux publics, à St-Prex, les transports en tous genres; exploitation d'une entreprise générale de construction.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FidOffice SA | Etoy | 20.12.2007 | 15.06.2020 | |
CONSULTANT TRUST COMPANY HOLDING AG in Liquidation | Zug | <2004 | 19.12.2007 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jean Chiavazza SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005304360, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jean Chiavazza SA, à Saint-Prex, CHE-101.513.969 (FOSC du 16.06.2020, p. 0/1004912024). Milliet Vincent maintenant domicilié à Lutry.
Publication number: HR02-1004912024, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jean Chiavazza S.A., à Saint-Prex, CHE-101.513.969 (FOSC du 29.11.2018, p. 0/1004509050). Statuts modifiés le 2 juin 2020.
Nouvelle graphie de la raison de commerce:
Jean Chiavazza SA. Les 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000 sont désormais restreintes quant à leur transmissibilité selon les statuts.
Communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Selon déclaration du 2 juin 2020, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte. FidOffice SA (CHE-106.762.244) n'est plus organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1004509050, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Jean Chiavazza S.A., à Saint-Prex, CHE-101.513.969 (FOSC du 30.05.2018, p. 0/4258871).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de Buchillon 6E, Case Postale 103, 1162 St-Prex.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.