Reports for JAS AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout JAS AG
- JAS AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Aarburg. JAS AG belongs to the industry «Production of clothing» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 12.10.1994 and has 3 persons in its management.
- On the 10.06.2024 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company JAS AG is registered under the UID CHE-107.655.332.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.10.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Aarburg
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.016.137-5
UID/VAT
CHE-107.655.332
Sector
Production of clothing
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Gestaltung und den Verkauf von Textilien, Schuhen, Sportgeräten, Uhren, Accessoires und Geschenkartikeln aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trecon Treuhand AG | Zürich | 19.08.2013 | 27.03.2022 | |
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Aarau | 11.08.2009 | 18.08.2013 | |
Pyrateam Treuhand AG | Rothrist | <2004 | 10.08.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- JAS Corporate Concept AG
- Ozon Butik AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: JAS AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006052537, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
JAS AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.655.332, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 49 vom 11.03.2024, Publ. 1005982406).
Domizil neu:
Bahnhofstrasse 34, 4663 Aarburg.
Publication number: HR02-1005982406, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
JAS AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.655.332, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 67 vom 05.04.2023, Publ. 1005718145).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Neuenschwander, Manuel, von Langnau im Emmental, in Hölstein, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Liechti, Nadja, von Rüderswil, in Zofingen, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005718145, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
JAS AG, in Aarburg, CHE-107.655.332, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 4 vom 06.01.2023, Publ. 1005646182).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schröter, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Osnabrück (DE), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lai, Fuk Sang, chinesischer Staatsangehöriger, in Hong Kong (CN), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Sumantyohadi, Mayveen, indonesischer Staatsangehöriger, in East Jakarta (ID), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Neuenschwander, Manuel, von Langnau im Emmental, in Hölstein, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.