Reports for Jaeger et Bosshard SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Jaeger et Bosshard SA
- Jaeger et Bosshard SA has its legal headquarters in Grand-Lancy, is active and operates in the sector «Recycling».
- Jaeger et Bosshard SA was founded on 23.11.1945.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 26.09.2023. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-107.858.237.
Management (11)
newest board members
Marco Feusi,
Dr. Gustav Felix Grisard,
Dr. Ivo Karl Grundler
newest authorized signatories
Yann Braune,
Pouyan Dardashti,
Sandra Raphaela Berchtold,
Thomas Schäfer,
Patrick Sydney Japhet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.11.1945
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lancy
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.340.977-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.858.237
Sector
Recycling
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Achat, vente, préparation et transformation de vieux fers, métaux et papier, de chiffons et autres déchets recyclables et produits dérivés, importation et exportation de ces matières, ainsi que courtage dans ces domaines.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 09.10.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 15.05.2014 | 08.10.2019 | |
BDO SA | Vernier | 09.01.2008 | 14.05.2014 | |
Sett Fiduciaire SA | Genève | <2004 | 08.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Jaeger et Bosshard SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005846238, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Jaeger et Bosshard SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.858.237 (FOSC du 09.03.2023, p. 0/1005697204). Les pouvoirs de Villella Flavio sont radiés. La procuration de Huber Jodok Anatol Ferdinand est radiée. Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Braune Yann, d'Allemagne, à Zurich, directeur général, Berchtold Sandra, de Giswil, à Wölflinswil, Dardashti Pouyan, d'Allemagne, à Rheinfelden et Schäfer Thomas, de et à Waldstatt.
Publication number: HR02-1005697204, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Jaeger et Bosshard SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.858.237 (FOSC du 23.01.2023, p. 0/1005659538). Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Japhet Patrick Sydney;
sa procuration est radiée. Signature collective à deux a été conférée à Hilber Stefan Andreas, de Degersheim, à Oberrohrdorf.
Publication number: HR02-1005659538, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
Jaeger et Bosshard SA, à Lancy, CHE-107.858.237 (FOSC du 12.12.2022, p. 0/1005626567). L'inscription no 22525 du 07.12.2022 est rectifiée en ce sens que Kaiser Sandro Fabian est originaire de Lohn-Ammannsegg (et non pas de Lenzburg).
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.