Reports for Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl
- Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl in Pully is a Limited liability company from the sector «Other construction». Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl is active.
- The management of the company Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl consists of one person.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 01.10.2010.
- The company's UID is CHE-115.608.027.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
20.04.2010
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Pully
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.068.034-8
UID/VAT
CHE-115.608.027
Sector
Other construction
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Les travaux et services dans le domaine de la construction et de l'entretien des bâtiments, en particulier l'isolation de bâtiments, le traitement de surfaces et matériaux, la pose de produits, pièces et installations destinés à l'isolation phonique, thermique ou autre, la peinture, les nettoyages et les états des lieux (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5835710, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl, à Pully, CH-550-1068034-8, les travaux et services dans le domaine de la construction et de l'entretien des bâtiments (FOSC du 25.06.2010, p. 24/5694406). L'associé Marmolejo Cedeno Ramon n'est plus gérant;
sa signature est radiée. L'associé Munoz Carlos reste seul gérant et signe désormais individuellement.
Publication number: 5694406, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl, à Pully, CH-550-1068034-8 (FOSC du 26.04.2010, p. 19/5603122). De la Cruz Dumpierrez Garcia Maximo, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède 3 parts de CHF 1'000 à l'associé-gérant Munoz Carlos, 3 parts de CHF 1'000 à l'associé-gérant Marmolejo Cedeno Ramon et 1 part de CHF 1'000 à Munoz Carlos et Marmolejo Cedeno Ramon, lesquels sont maintenant chacun titulaire de 10 parts de CHF 1'000 et 1 part indivise de CHF 1'000 et signent désormais collectivement à deux. Munoz Carlos est représentant commun de la part indivise.
Publication number: 5603122, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Isoland Rénovation de Façades Sàrl, à Pully, avenue de Villardin 11, 1009 Pully, CH-550-1068034-8. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
14 avril 2010.
But:
les travaux et services dans le domaine de la construction et de l'entretien des bâtiments, en particulier l'isolation de bâtiments, le traitement de surfaces et matériaux, la pose de produits, pièces et installations destinés à l'isolation phonique, thermique ou autre, la peinture, les nettoyages et les états des lieux (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Capital social:
CHF 21'000.
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Associés-gérants avec signature collective à trois:
Munoz Carlos, d'Hellikon, à Pully, président, De la Cruz Dumpierrez Garcia Maximo, d'Espagne, à Genève, vice-président, et Marmolejo Cedeno Ramon, d'Equateur, à Prilly, chacun avec 7 parts de CHF 1'000.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par e-mail. Selon déclaration des gérants du 14 avril 2010, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.