Reports for Intrasub S.A.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Intrasub S.A.
- Intrasub S.A. with its legal headquarters in Vevey is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Underground lines and sewage treatment plants». Intrasub S.A. is active.
- The company was founded on 07.05.1991.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 18.03.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-106.851.474.
Management (4)
newest board members
Alain Berrut-Maréchaud,
Christophe Charbonnet,
Yvon Steininger
newest authorized signatories
Alain Berrut-Maréchaud,
Christophe Charbonnet,
Yvon Steininger,
Joël Steininger
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.05.1991
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Vevey
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.124.044-1
UID/VAT
CHE-106.851.474
Sector
Underground lines and sewage treatment plants
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toutes interventions et travaux subaquatiques, lacustres et sous-lacustres, avec notamment contrôle de travaux au moyen de caméra-vidéo.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GF Audit SA | Blonay - Saint-Légier | 14.05.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FIDEXPERT SA RIVIERA | Montreux | <2004 | 13.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Intrasub S.A.
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005127548, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Intrasub S.A., à Vevey, CHE-106.851.474 (FOSC du 19.12.2018, p. 0/1004525427). Hagmann André n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Berrut-Maréchaud Alain, de Troistorrents, à Onex, est membre du conseil d'administration avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1004525427, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Intrasub S.A., à Vevey, CHE-106.851.474 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). L'administrateur Steininger Yvon signe désormais collectivement à deux.
Nouveaux administrateurs avec signature collective à deux:
Charbonnet Christophe, de Nendaz, à Saint-Saphorin (Lavaux), président, et Hagmann André, de Däniken, à Meyrin.
Publication number: 6580292, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Intrasub S.A., à Vevey, CH-550-0124044-1, toutes interventions et travaux subaquatiques (FOSC du 14.05.2010, p. 19/5632764). Console Antonio n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Steininger Yvon, qui n'est plus président, reste seul administrateur et continue de signer individuellement. Signature collective à deux est conférée à Steininger Joël, de Neuchâtel, à Montreux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.