Reports for Interstein Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Interstein Holding AG
- Interstein Holding AG with its legal headquarters in Andhausen is active. Interstein Holding AG operates in the sector «Operation of other financial institutions».
- The management of the company Interstein Holding AG, which was founded on the 11.12.2003, consists of 5 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.04.2024.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-110.344.826.
- HOTIME AG, podarok consulting ag have the same address as Interstein Holding AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Helena Häusler,
Alexander Tilgner,
Martin Tobler,
Gregor Barmet,
Marc Schega
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Berg (TG)
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.016.776-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.344.826
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Kaufen, Verkaufen, Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens sowie der Tochtergesellschaft und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, insbesondere alle der Verwirklichung ihres Zweckes förderlichen kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden | Weinfelden | 06.11.2012 | 02.05.2019 | |
Steffen & Rausch Unternehmensberatung AG | Weinfelden | <2004 | 05.11.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- NSR Holding AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Interstein Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006010305, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Interstein Holding AG, in Berg (TG), CHE-110.344.826, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 13 vom 19.01.2024, Publ. 1005939223).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tilgner, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wehr (DE), Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Häusler, Helena, von Gondiswil, in Grabs, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005939223, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Interstein Holding AG, in Berg (TG), CHE-110.344.826, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2019, Publ. 1004622913).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Merino Rotonda, Mario, von Münsterlingen, in Andhausen (Berg (TG)), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Tilgner, Alexander, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wehr (DE), Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Hofmann, Gerhard, von Kreuzlingen, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tobler, Martin, von Speicher, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schega, Marc, von Uetikon am See, in Knonau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Barmet, Gregor, von Eschenbach (LU), in Solothurn, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004622913, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Interstein Holding AG, in Berg (TG), CHE-110.344.826, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 125 vom 02.07.2018, Publ. 4328871).
Statutenänderung:
23.04.2019.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt das Kaufen, Verkaufen, Halten und Verwalten von Beteiligungen. Die Gesellschaft kann im Übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, welche geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens sowie der Tochtergesellschaft und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszweckes zu fördern oder zu erleichtern, insbesondere alle der Verwirklichung ihres Zweckes förderlichen kommerziellen und finanziellen Transaktionen durchführen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief oder E-Mail an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Die Gesellschaft hat mit Erklärung vom 23.04.2019 auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
steffen rausch kessler ag weinfelden (CH-440.3.014.219-5), in Weinfelden, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.