Reports for International Space Science Institute (ISSI)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout International Space Science Institute (ISSI)
- International Space Science Institute (ISSI) from Bern operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The management has 15 active persons registered.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 07.12.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.700.127.
- Companies with the same address as International Space Science Institute (ISSI): bblubb Seifenfactory GmbH, Frey-Ryf AG, Shylou Yapura GmbH.
Management (15)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Prof. Willi Benz,
Dr. Hitoshi Kuninaka,
Dr. Holger Gerd Peter Wentscher,
Dr. Linda Tacconi,
Prof. Dr. Monica Tosi
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Willi Benz,
Dr. Antonella Nota,
Prof. Dr. Monica Tosi,
Prof. Dr. Maurizio Falanga
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.03.1995
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.017.009-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.700.127
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Errichtung, Unterhalt und Betrieb eines Instituts zur Förderung der internationalen Koordination und Zusammenarbeit in der Weltraumforschung sowie zur Durchführung vorbereitender Studien für künftige Weltraumforschungsziele. Durch die Schaffung eines Zentrums für Weltraumwissenschaften soll die wissenschaftliche Auswertung und Integration der Daten unterschiedlicher Instrumente aus verschiedenen Weltraummissionen ermöglicht werden, wobei Beobachtungen von der Erde aus sowie Laboratoriumsdaten sinnvoll einbezogen werden sollen. Insbesondere bezweckt die Stiftung die interdisziplinäre Interpretation solcher Daten und Erkenntnisse in einem weiteren wissenschaftlichen Kontext unter Einbezug der Methoden und Prinzipien der relevanten mathematischen und naturwissenschaftlichen Disziplinen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
T + R AG | Muri bei Bern | 11.10.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | 24.12.2008 | 10.10.2018 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- International Space Science Institute ISSI
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: International Space Science Institute (ISSI)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005903535, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
International Space Science Institute (ISSI), in Bern, CHE-109.700.127, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2023, Publ. 1005845475).
Urkundenänderung:
23.10.2023. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]
Publication number: HR02-1005845475, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
International Space Science Institute (ISSI), in Bern, CHE-109.700.127, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 21 vom 31.01.2023, Publ. 1005665584).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Meylan, Georges Christian Prof., von Le Chenit, in Lausanne, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Fisk, Lennard, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Ann Arbor (US), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hasinger, Günther Prof. Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Madrid (ES), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Benz, Willi Prof. Dr., von Illnau-Effretikon, in Neuchâtel, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Benz, Willi Prof., Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Publication number: HR02-1005665584, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
International Space Science Institute (ISSI), in Bern, CHE-109.700.127, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2022, Publ. 1005388714).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bleeker, Johannes Prof., genannt Johan, niederländischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wassenaar (NL), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Dehant, Véronique Prof., belgische Staatsangehörige, in Waterloo (BE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Fürst, Daniel Dr., von Kerzers, in Murten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Spohn, Tilmann Prof. Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Berlin (DE), Vorsitzender der Direktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kuninaka, Hitoshi Dr., japanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Kawasaki (Kanagawa) (JP), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Tacconi, Linda Dr., amerikanische Staatsangehörige, in Garching (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Thomas, Nicolas Gordon Morgan, irischer Staatsangehöriger, in Stettlen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wentscher, Holger Dr., deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Unterengstringen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Nota, Antonella Dr., italienische Staatsangehörige, in Towson (US), Vorsitzende der Direktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.