Reports for insure me gmbh
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout insure me gmbh
- insure me gmbh has its legal headquarters in Eich and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Services for insurance and pensions».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 28.04.2017.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 07.02.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company insure me gmbh is registered under the UID CHE-241.246.568.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.04.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Eich
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.4.803.709-8
UID/VAT
CHE-241.246.568
Sector
Services for insurance and pensions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Verbraucher- und Beratungsportals; Angebot von Beratung und Vermittlung von Versicherungen, Vorsorge- und Finanzprodukten; Halten, Erwerb und Verleih von Patenten und Lizenzen; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Belastung, Veräusserung und Verwaltung von Grundeigentum; Vornahme von Finanzierungen; Eingehung von Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: insure me gmbh
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005671681, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
insure me gmbh, in Eich, CHE-241.246.568, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 32 vom 15.02.2022, Publ. 1005405720).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amendt, Till, von Luzern, in Eich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 102 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pena Rama, David, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 204 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 102 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1005405720, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
insure me gmbh, in Kriens, CHE-241.246.568, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 06.10.2021, Publ. 1005306066).
Statutenänderung:
08.02.2022.
Sitz neu:
Eich.
Domizil neu:
Spillgässli 12, 6205 Eich. [Weitere Änderungen berühren keine publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amendt, Till, von Luzern, in Eich, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 102 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: in Kriens].
Publication number: HR02-1005306066, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
insure me gmbh, in Buchrain, CHE-241.246.568, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 17.10.2019, Publ. 1004739579).
Statutenänderung:
30.09.2021.
Sitz neu:
Kriens.
Domizil neu:
Feldmühlestrasse 20, 6010 Kriens.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Köchli, Dominic, von Seeberg, in Greppen, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 51 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00;
Viqueira Rama, Rubén, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Neuenkirch, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 51 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Amendt, Till, von Luzern, in Kriens, Gesellschafter und Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 102 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 51 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00];
Pena Rama, David, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Luzern, Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 102 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 51 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.