Address
Chemin des Bulesses 70
1814 La Tour-de-Peilz
Reports for Inopaq Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Inopaq Sàrl
- Inopaq Sàrl is currently active and the industry «Architectural and engineering activities». The legal headquarters are in La Tour-de-Peilz.
- The management of the company Inopaq Sàrl, which was founded on the 24.05.2005, consists of 3 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 18.08.2020.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-112.370.622.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.05.2005
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
La Tour-de-Peilz
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.044.068-3
UID/VAT
CHE-112.370.622
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour buts la commercialisation, la vente, l'achat, la distribution, l'importation, l'exportation et la production de produits dans les domaines de l'optique, de l'électronique, de la microtechnologie, et de l'électromécanique (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Inopaq Technologies Sàrl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Inopaq Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004960144, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Inopaq Sàrl, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-112.370.622 (FOSC du 17.03.2020, p. 0/1004854688). Würsch Alain, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 370 parts de CHF 100 à Würsch Pierre, de Montreux, à La Tour-de-Peilz, nouvel associé-gérant avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004854688, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Inopaq Technologies Sàrl, à La Tour-de-Peilz, CHE-112.370.622 (FOSC du 29.08.2019, p. 0/1004705494). Statuts modifiés le 3 février 2020.
Nouvelle raison de commerce:
Inopaq Sàrl. Augmentation du capital social.
Nouveau capital social:
CHF 60'000, divisé en 600 parts de CHF 100. Würsch Alain, associé-gérant, est désormais titulaire de 370 parts de CHF 100.
Nouveaux associés sans signature:
Inopaq Sàrl (CHE-112.370.622), à La Tour-de-Peilz, avec 60 parts de CHF 100, et Merminod Antoine, d'Essertines-sur-Rolle, à Gimel, avec 170 parts de CHF 100.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.