Branches (2)
Reports for Infranor Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Infranor Holding SA
- Infranor Holding SA from Yverdon-les-Bains operates in the sector «Business management and administration» and is active.
- The management of the company Infranor Holding SA, which was founded on the 16.01.1941, consists of 6 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 25.07.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register VD under the UID CHE-105.817.718.
- In the IPI there are 11 trademarks or applications registered by the company Infranor Holding SA.
- On the same address as Infranor Holding SA there are 9 other active companies registered. These include: Adonite SA, Alba IT Services Sàrl, ALVMAC swiss Sàrl.
Management (6)
newest board members
Gianpaolo Turri,
Qun Lei,
Christian Henri Perrudet,
Tenghui Huang,
Yonglin Xiao
newest authorized signatories
Hakan Pfeiffer,
Gianpaolo Turri,
Qun Lei,
Christian Henri Perrudet,
Tenghui Huang
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.01.1941
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Yverdon-les-Bains
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.105.200-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.817.718
CHE-116.325.454 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but l'acquisition et la gestion à long terme de participations à d'autres entreprises ainsi que l'acquisition, la mise en valeur et la vente de marques commerciales, brevets et procédés de fabrication, notamment dans le domaine de l'automatisation (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 27.04.2004 | 22.09.2009 | |
Fiduciaire Heller S.A. | Nyon | <2004 | 26.04.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Infranor Holding Inc
- Infranor Holding AG
- Infranor S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
31.07.2023 | active | 09359/2023 | |
INFRANOR | 31.07.2023 | active | 09357/2023 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Infranor Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005803757, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Infranor Holding SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-105.817.718 (FOSC du 01.02.2023, p. 0/1005667343). van Griethuysen Jean-Pierre n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Publication number: HR02-1005667343, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Infranor Holding SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-105.817.718 (FOSC du 07.10.2022, p. 0/1005578568).
Nouvelle adresse:
Rue Galilée 4, 1400 Yverdon-les-Bains.
Publication number: HR02-1005578568, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Infranor Holding SA, à Yverdon-les-Bains, CHE-105.817.718 (FOSC du 07.04.2022, p. 0/1005445808). Signature collective à deux est conférée à Pfeiffer Hakan, de Zürich, à Chexbres, directeur.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.