Address
Avenue des Morgines 12
1213 Petit-Lancy
Reports for INERGY SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout INERGY SA
- INERGY SA has its legal headquarters in Petit-Lancy and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Trading in IT and communications products».
- The management of the company INERGY SA, which was founded on the 13.02.2003, consists of 8 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 10.04.2024.
- INERGY SA is registered in the Canton of GE under the UID CHE-109.894.600.
- The address is identical with 58 other active companies. These include: A. T. Business Sàrl, AC2S Fiduciaire Sàrl, Acolad Switzerland AG, succursale du Petit-Lancy.
Management (8)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
François Pflieger,
Luc Schenkel,
Jean-Frédéric Lasserre,
Frédérique Diant,
Sébastien Morando
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.02.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lancy
Commercial Registry Office
GE
Commercial register number
CH-660.0.359.003-1
UID/VAT
CHE-109.894.600
CHE-116.272.958 VAT
Sector
Trading in IT and communications products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Commerce de systèmes et de solutions d'impression.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ECHO SA | Genève | 21.01.2008 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Auditoria SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 20.01.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: INERGY SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006005960, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
INERGY SA, à Lancy, CHE-109.894.600 (FOSC du 09.03.2023, p. 0/1005697203). Les pouvoirs de Aeberli Maud sont radiés. Diant Frédérique est maintenant originaire de Thônex. Signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur a été conférée à Pflieger François, de et à Tolochenaz.
Publication number: HR02-1005697203, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
INERGY SA, à Lancy, CHE-109.894.600 (FOSC du 19.05.2022, p. 0/1005478158). La procuration de Husson Marie et de Valente Sandra est radiée. Signature collective à deux, avec un administrateur a été conférée à Schenkel Luc, de Genève, à Bassins.
Publication number: HR02-1005478158, Commercial Registry Office Geneva, (660)
INERGY SA, à Lancy, CHE-109.894.600 (FOSC du 21.12.2021, p. 0/1005363518). Les pouvoirs de Papinot Jérôme sont radiés. Devillard Marc est maintenant domicilié à Fully.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.