Address
c/o Peter Germann
Luzernerstrasse 51a
6010 Kriens
Reports for Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens
- Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Kriens. Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens belongs to the industry «Building installations» and is currently active.
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 23.01.1989.
- The last commercial register change was made on 09.11.2020. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The organization Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens is registered under the UID CHE-101.520.573.
- Companies with an identical address: Artevent AG, auris personal treuhand gmbh, Dr. med. dent. Christoph Zwinggi AG.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Dr. Hans-Rudolf Jung,
Hans Bachmann,
Daniel Hofmeister,
Patrick Grieder
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Hans-Rudolf Jung,
Hans Bachmann,
Daniel Hofmeister,
Patrick Grieder
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.1989
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Kriens
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.5.007.025-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.520.573
Sector
Building installations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Anschluss von Industrie- und Gewerbebauten an das Verkehrsnetz der Schweizerischen Bundesbahnen in gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe durch Bau, Betrieb und Unterhalt von einem oder mehreren privaten normalspurigen Industriegleisen ab Gleisen der Schweizerischen Bundesbahnen (SBB) oder der zentralbahn (zb) bis in die Industriegebiete der Gemeinden Kriens und Horw; Gewährung weiterer Anschlüsse gegen entsprechende Kostenbeteiligung oder Erweiterung bestehender Gleisanlagen; Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundstücken und Dienstbarkeiten; Erwerb, Bau und Veräusserung von Gleisanlagen; Erwerb und Einräumung von Dienstbarkeiten; Errichtung, Kauf, Erstellung, Verkauf oder Vermietung von Gebäuden, soweit ein Zusammenhang mit dem Genossenschaftszweck besteht; Anschaffung eigener schienengebundener Traktionsmittel und Betrieb derselben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Pius Bienz Treuhand- und Revisions-AG | Kriens | 02.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Industrie-Geleise-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens
- Industrie-Geleise-Genossenschaft
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005017846, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens, in Kriens, CHE-101.520.573, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 141 vom 24.07.2018, Publ. 4377555).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Marty, Daniel, von Zürich, in Urdorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Faé, Franco, von Luzern, in Kriens, Mitglied und Sekretär der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meier, Daniel, von Obersiggenthal, in Kriens, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann, Hans, von Meggen und Luzern, in Meggen, Präsident der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Jung, Hans Rudolf, von Horw, in Horw, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Grieder, Patrick, von Eptingen, in Sachseln, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hofmeister, Daniel, von Luzern, in Stansstad, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4377555, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens, in Kriens, CHE-101.520.573, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2017, Publ. 3648137).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jurt, Bernhard, von Luzern, in Luzern, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Daniel, von Obersiggenthal, in Kriens, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3648137, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Industriegleis-Genossenschaft Horw-Kriens, in Kriens, CHE-101.520.573, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2016, Publ. 3015603).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bircher, André, von Stansstad, in Beckenried, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Marty, Daniel, von Zürich, in Urdorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.