Reports for Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen
- Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen with its legal headquarters in Emmen is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen is active.
- The management of the company Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 08.03.1972.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 10.11.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register LU under the UID CHE-100.839.859.
Management (5)
newest board members
Didier André Maus,
Alexandre Richard Nodale,
Jean-Yves Bieri,
Thierry Patrick Steininger,
Pierre-André Franck Maus
newest authorized signatories
Didier André Maus,
Alexandre Richard Nodale,
Jean-Yves Bieri,
Thierry Patrick Steininger,
Pierre-André Franck Maus
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.03.1972
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Emmen
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.008.360-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.839.859
CHE-116.267.650 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb und Verkauf von Grundstücken (überbaut und nicht überbaut), insbesondere in der Gemeinde Emmen (Kanton Luzern), zum Zwecke der Überbauung mit grossflächigen Einkaufscentern; Bestellung von Baurechten für Dritte; Vermietung von einzelnen Teilen von Einkaufscentren; Betrieb von Einkaufscentern, mit Ausschluss des Betriebs von eigenen Detailverkaufsgeschäften oder Kaufhäusern; Erwerb, Verwaltung, Belastung und Veräusserung von Grundeigentum sowie Urheberrechten, Patenten und Lizenzen; Vornahme von Finanzierungen; Zurverfügungstellung von Garantien, Bürgschaften und anderen Sicherheiten zugunsten von nahestehenden Gesellschaften oder Dritten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young SA | Lancy | 28.06.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005881818, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen, in Emmen, CHE-100.839.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 31 vom 15.02.2021, Publ. 1005100544).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Aufseesser, Ron, von Genève, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005100544, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen, in Emmen, CHE-100.839.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 28.06.2018, Publ. 4321093).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Halff, Thierry, von Basel, in Gy, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Maus, Didier, von Genève, in Hermance, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Genf, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Aufseesser, Ron, von Genève, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Bieri, Jean-Yves, von Langnau im Emmental, in Chigny, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nodale, Alexandre, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Paris (FR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Steininger, Thierry, von Villars-sous-Yens, in Genève, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4321093, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Immobiliengesellschaft Oberhof AG Emmen, in Emmen, CHE-100.839.859, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 19.07.2016, Publ. 2960907).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KPMG SA (CHE-269.292.664), in Genf, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young SA (CHE-186.791.979), in Lancy, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.