Reports for hpc hofmann partner consulting ag
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout hpc hofmann partner consulting ag
- hpc hofmann partner consulting ag is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Sisseln AG. hpc hofmann partner consulting ag belongs to the industry «Operation of other financial institutions» and is currently active.
- The management has one active person registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 08.07.2013. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company is registered in the commercial register AG under the UID CHE-103.748.242.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.06.1969
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sisseln
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.925.073-6
UID/VAT
CHE-103.748.242
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten, Verwalten und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Industrie-, Handels- und Gewerbeunternehmen sowie von anderen beweglichen Vermögenswerten im In- und Ausland, Übernahme von Treuhandmandaten, Vermögensverwaltungen und Unternehmensberatungen; kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen errichten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Waldmeier Treuhand AG | Therwil | <2004 | 20.07.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Haas Präzision AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: hpc hofmann partner consulting ag
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 964267, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
hpc hofmann partner consulting ag, in Sisseln, CHE-103.748.242, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 16 vom 24.01.2011, S. 2, Publ. 5999978).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hofmann, Jules W., von Stein AG, in Sisseln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 5999978, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
hpc hofmann partner consulting ag, in Sisseln, CH-400.3.925.073-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 138 vom 21.07.2009, S. 2, Publ. 5151932).
Domizil neu:
Waldstrasse 3, 4334 Sisseln.
Publication number: 5151932, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Haas Präzision AG, in Rheinfelden, CH-400.3.925.073-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 90 vom 12.05.1998, S. 3205).
Statutenänderung:
09.07.2009.
Firma neu:
hpc hofmann partner consulting ag.
Sitz neu:
Sisseln.
Domizil neu:
Rosenweg 9, 4334 Sisseln.
Zweck neu:
Erwerb, Halten, Verwalten und Veräusserung von Beteiligungen an Industrie-, Handels- und Gewerbeunternehmen sowie von anderen beweglichen Vermögenswerten im In- und Ausland, Übernahme von Treuhandmandaten, Vermögensverwaltungen und Unternehmensberatungen;
kann Liegenschaften und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, belasten und veräussern sowie Zweigniederlassungen und Agenturen errichten.
Mitteilungen neu:
Die Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen schriftlich an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung neu:
[Die Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist aufgehoben.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 09.07.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Haas, Carl Jens, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schramberg (D), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Oesch, Hans, von Oberlangenegg, in Magden, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Waldmeier Treuhand AG, in Therwil, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hofmann, Jules W., von Stein AG, in Sisseln, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Stein AG, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Hofmann, Yvonne, von Stein AG, in Sisseln, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.