Reports for Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA
- Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Attalens. Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA belongs to the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA, which was founded on the 18.12.2018, consists of one person.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 22.11.2021.
- In the commercial register the company Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA is registered under the UID CHE-389.854.554.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.12.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Attalens
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.568.830-5
UID/VAT
CHE-389.854.554
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la gestion et l'exploitation d'établissements publics, en particulier de restaurants, cafés, bars et hôtels. La société peut constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger et participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger. La société peut acquérir, détenir et aliéner des immeubles. La société peut exercer toutes les activités commerciales, financières et autres en rapport avec son but.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005339101, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA, à Attalens, CHE-389.854.554 (FOSC du 09.07.2019, p. 0/1004671276).
Personnes radiées:
Riedo Nicolas Roger, administrateur, président, signature individuelle;
Riedo Patrick, signature individuelle.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Riedo Yan, administrateur, secrétaire, signature individuelle, maintenant de Tafers (fusion de commune), désormais administrateur, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004671276, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA, à Attalens, CHE-389.854.554 (FOSC du 21.12.2018, p. 0/1004527761).
Nouvelle personne inscrite:
Riedo Patrick, de St. Antoni, à Villars-sur-Glâne, signature individuelle.
Publication number: HR01-1004527761, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Hôtel de Ville Attalens SA, à Attalens, Rue du Château 1, 1616 Attalens, CHE-389.854.554. Nouvelle société anonyme. Statuts du 07.12.2018.
But:
La société a pour but la gestion et l'exploitation d'établissements publics, en particulier de restaurants, cafés, bars et hôtels. La société peut constituer des succursales et des filiales en Suisse et à l'étranger et participer à d'autres entreprises en Suisse et à l'étranger. La société peut acquérir, détenir et aliéner des immeubles. La société peut exercer toutes les activités commerciales, financières et autres en rapport avec son but.
Capital-actions:
CHF 100'000, entièrement libéré, divisé en 100 actions de CHF 1'000, nominatives.
Reprise de biens envisagée:
La société envisage de reprendre un lot de matériel, mobilier, appareils, ustensiles et stock pour le prix maximum de CHF 200'000.
Organe de publication:
FOSC.
Communication aux actionnaires:
par lettre, ou par courriel.
Personnes inscrites:
Riedo Nicolas Roger, de St. Antoni, à Villars-sur-Glâne, administrateur président, signature individuelle;
Riedo Yan, de St. Antoni, à Villars-sur-Glâne, administrateur secrétaire, signature individuelle. Selon déclaration du 07.12.2018, la société n'est pas soumise à un contrôle ordinaire et renonce à un contrôle restreint.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.