Reports for Holding Buchard SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Holding Buchard SA
- Holding Buchard SA has its legal headquarters in Leytron and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of investment companies».
- The management consists of 11 persons. The company was founded on 26.04.2017.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 30.08.2023.
- In the commercial register the company Holding Buchard SA is registered under the UID CHE-205.160.385.
- There are 4 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Buchard Atelier-Carrosserie Bus&Cars SA, Immobilier Buchard SA, Régional Buchard SA.
Management (11)
newest board members
Céline Udriot,
Jean Michel Albert Buchard,
Emmanuel Paul Bonvin,
Raymond Carrupt,
Danièle Buchard Buchard
newest authorized signatories
Céline Udriot,
Jean Michel Albert Buchard,
Julien Jean-Bernard Droz,
François Robert Buchard,
Emmanuel Paul Bonvin
Executive board
Julien Jean-Bernard Droz,
François Robert Buchard,
Grégoire-Nestor-René Buthey,
Jacques-Antoine Magnenat,
Julien Fallet
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.04.2017
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Leytron
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.009.200-5
UID/VAT
CHE-205.160.385
CHE-449.772.867 VAT
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Acquisition, vente, administration et gestion de participations à des entreprises commerciales, industrielles, financières ou de services en Suisse et à l'étranger (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 01.05.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Holding Buchard SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005827132, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Holding Buchard SA, à Leytron, CHE-205.160.385, société anonyme (No. FOSC 143 du 26.07.2022, Publ. 1005529622).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Udriot, Céline, de Monthey, à Chardonne, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005529622, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Holding Buchard SA, à Leytron, CHE-205.160.385, société anonyme (No. FOSC 114 du 16.06.2021, Publ. 1005219376).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Emery, Nicolas, de Lens, à Sion, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Buchard, Jean Michel Albert, de Leytron, à Leytron, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Mudry, Danièle Josiane, de Riddes, à Sion, secrétaire (hors-conseil), sans droit de signature;
Droz, Julien Jean-Bernard, de Orsières, à Savièse, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux;
Fallet, Julien, de Val-de-Ruz, à Fully, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: secrétaire (hors-conseil), membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux].
Publication number: HR02-1005219376, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Holding Buchard SA, à Leytron, CHE-205.160.385, société anonyme (No. FOSC 161 du 22.08.2018, Publ. 4428721).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Buchard, Jean Michel Albert, de Leytron, à Leytron, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Buchard, Nicole Huguette, de Leytron, à Leytron, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Coudray, Marie José, de Chamoson, à Leytron, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Udriot, Anne Françoise Véronique, de Leytron, à Leytron, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Carrupt, Raymond, de Chamoson, à Chamoson, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Bonvin, Emmanuel Paul, de Lens, à Sion, vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Buchard, Danielle, de Leytron, à Leytron, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administratrice, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux];
Fallet, Julien, de Val-de-Ruz, à Fully, secrétaire (hors-conseil), membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux;
Buchard, François Robert, de Leytron, à Martigny, directeur général, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: sans fonction inscrite, avec signature collective à deux avec un administrateur];
Buthey, Grégoire-Nestor-René, de Fully, à Saillon, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux;
Emery, Nicolas, de Lens, à Sion, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux;
Magnenat, Jacques-Antoine, de Vaulion, à Chamoson, membre de la direction, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.