Reports for Holag Handels AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Holag Handels AG
- Holag Handels AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Emmen. Holag Handels AG belongs to the industry «Trading with machines» and is currently active.
- The company was founded on 28.04.1997.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 27.09.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The company is registered in the commercial register LU under the UID CHE-104.420.956.
- On the same address as Holag Handels AG there are 4 other active companies registered. These include: Helico GmbH, Holag AG, Mess Mode GmbH.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.04.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Emmen
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.019.942-4
UID/VAT
CHE-104.420.956
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Waren aller Art, vor allem im Bereich Klima- und Kältetechnik sowie verschiedene Vertretungen; Vermittlung, Beratung, Planung, Realisation und Rückbau mobiler Wärmeerzeuger für Veranstaltungen in ökologisch sensiblen Gebieten; Beteiligungen; Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Partner Treuhand AG, Luzern | Luzern | <2004 | 18.06.2017 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Holag AG
- Holag-M AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Holag Handels AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005569739, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Holag Handels AG, in Emmen, CHE-104.420.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 186 vom 26.09.2017, Publ. 3772055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holenstein, Hans Peter, von Bütschwil-Ganterschwil, in Beromünster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bühlmann, Andreas, von Rothenburg, in Luzern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3772055, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Holag Handels AG, in Emmen, CHE-104.420.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2017, Publ. 3586993).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simic-Frei, Maja, von Neuenkirch, in Arni (AG), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 3586993, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Holag AG, in Emmen, CHE-104.420.956, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2016, Publ. 2919483).
Statutenänderung:
13.06.2017.
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Gesellschaft überträgt gemäss Vertrag vom 13.06.2017 Aktiven von CHF 335'469.25 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 312'931.05 auf die Holag AG, in Emmen (CHE-477.633.076).
Gegenleistung:
keine.
Firma neu:
Holag Handels AG.
Zweck neu:
Handel mit Waren aller Art, vor allem im Bereich Klima- und Kältetechnik sowie verschiedene Vertretungen;
Vermittlung, Beratung, Planung, Realisation und Rückbau mobiler Wärmeerzeuger für Veranstaltungen in ökologisch sensiblen Gebieten;
Beteiligungen;
Erwerb, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 13.06.2017 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Holenstein, Wilma, von Bütschwil, in Beromünster, Sekretärin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Partner Treuhand AG, Luzern (CHE-107.252.951), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Holenstein, Hans Peter, von Bütschwil-Ganterschwil, in Beromünster, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Bütschwil, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.