Reports for Höfler Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Höfler Immobilien AG
- Höfler Immobilien AG from Frick operates in the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is active.
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 07.05.2024.
- The company's UID is CHE-104.438.034.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Fluri,
Daniel Knecht,
Adrian Schlatter,
Matthias Daniel Knecht,
Sarah Keiser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Frick
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-280.2.000.283-9
UID/VAT
CHE-104.438.034
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringung von Dienstleistungen im Bereich Immobilien aller Art, insbesondere Erwerb, Überbauung, Verwaltung und Veräusserung von Grundstücken; die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Höfler & Co
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Höfler Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006026781, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Höfler Immobilien AG, in Frick, CHE-104.438.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 183 vom 21.09.2020, Publ. 1004982642).
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 26, 5070 Frick.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knecht, Pascal, von Schwaderloch, in Brugg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Zürich];
Fluri, Patrick, von Luterbach, in Luterbach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Keiser, Sarah, von Hergiswil (NW), in Oberrohrdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien [bisher: in Niederrohrdorf].
Publication number: HR02-1004982642, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Höfler Immobilien AG, in Frick, CHE-104.438.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 191 vom 03.10.2019, Publ. 1004729587).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmid, Kurt, von Lengnau (AG), in Lengnau (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knecht, Daniel, von Windisch, in Windisch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Knecht, Matthias, von Döttingen, in Windisch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schlatter, Adrian, von Gontenschwil, in Hausen (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Knecht, Pascal, von Schwaderloch, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Keiser, Sarah, von Hergiswil (NW), in Niederrohrdorf, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004729587, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Höfler Immobilien AG, in Frick, CHE-104.438.034, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 07.07.2011, S.0, Publ. 6242360).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Höfler, Alfred, von Burg im Leimental, in Lausen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Korach, Robert Alex, von Kilchberg ZH, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Sommerhalder, Rudolf, von Burg AG, in Meggen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Kurt, von Lengnau (AG), in Lengnau (AG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.