Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for Hiob-Stiftung
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.12.1993
Deletion from the commercial register
10.09.2014
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Ittigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.016.992-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.947.490
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterstützung karitativer Brockenstuben, insb. von Hiob-International, Verein mit Sitz in Worblaufen, Gde Ittigen, durch Zurverfügungstellung von Betriebsräumen und weiterer Infrastruktur; die Stiftung kann Grundstücke erwerben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HST Treuhand AG | Thierachern | 26.05.2010 | 09.09.2014 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hiob-Stiftung
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 1707963, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hiob-Stiftung, in Ittigen, CHE-109.947.490, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 201 vom 16.10.2012, Publ. 6891748).
Vermögensübertragung:
Die Stiftung überträgt gemäss Vermögensübertragungsvertrag vom 23.08.2013 mit Inventar sowie Verfügung der Aufsichtsbehörde vom 19.12.2013 Aktiven von CHF 1'861'186.35 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 984'364.80 auf den Verein HIOB - International, in Steffisburg (CHE-106.038.473).
Gegenleistung:
CHF 0.00. Die Stiftung ist gemäss Verfügung des Eidgenössischen Departements des Innern EDI vom 19.12.2013 aufgehoben. Die Stiftung wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 6891748, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hiob-Stiftung, in Ittigen, CH-035.7.016.992-0, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 26.05.2010, S. 4, Publ. 5646426).
Organisation neu:
[Streichung der Organisation von Amtes wegen, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmocker, Walter, von Habkern, in Thun, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Indermühle, Daniel, von Amsoldingen, in Uttigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 5646426, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Hiob-Stiftung, in Ittigen, CH-035.7.016.992-0, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 241 vom 12.12.2005, S. 3, Publ. 3143944).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jundt, Matthias, von Binningen, in Langenthal, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Ibach, Christian, von Hilterfingen, in Hilterfingen, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Trachsel, Hans Ulrich, von Frutigen, in Reichenbach im Kandertal, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Indermühle, Daniel, von Amsoldingen, in Uttigen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
HST Treuhand AG (CH-092.3.001.131-6), in Thierachern, Revisionsstelle.