Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Branches (1)
Reports for Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.06.2004
Deletion from the commercial register
17.04.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zug
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.027.283-7
UID/VAT
CHE-111.697.486
Sector
Fund management
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Vermögensberatung sowie Erbringung von Finanzgeschäften aller Art; kann sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, solche übernehmen und direkt oder indirekt Unternehmen finanzieren an welchen sie Beteiligungen hält.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 22.06.2010 | 16.04.2015 | |
Deloitte AG | Zürich | 07.06.2004 | 21.06.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Helvetica Wealth Management Partners SA en liquidation
- Helvetica Wealth Management Partners Ltd in liquidation
- Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2103041, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG in Liquidation, in Zug, CHE-111.697.486, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 37 vom 24.02.2014, Publ. 1362047). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: 1362047, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG, in Zug, CHE-111.697.486, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 16.04.2013, Publ. 7148944).
Firma neu:
Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(Helvetica Wealth Management Partners SA en liquidation) (Helvetica Wealth Management Partners Ltd in liquidation).
Aktien neu:
909'091 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00. [bisher: 909091 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00].
Partizipationsscheine neu:
90'909 Namenpartizipationsscheine zu CHF 1.00. [bisher: 90909 vinkulierte Namenpartizipationsscheine zu CHF 1.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien und Namenpartizipationsscheinen ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 07.02.2014 aufgelöst.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Robert, von Luzern, in Zürich, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift und Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift];
Masefield, Sir Charles Beech Gordon, britischer Staatsangehöriger, in Markyate (UK), Liquidator, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien und Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 7148944, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Helvetica Wealth Management Partners AG, in Zug, CH-170.3.027.283-7, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 17 vom 25.01.2013, Publ. 7033622).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rentsch, Christophe Guy, von Trub, in Zürich, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Robert, von Luzern, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].