Address
Suhrenmattstrasse 29
5035 Unterentfelden
Reports for health and life AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout health and life AG
- health and life AG with its legal headquarters in Unterentfelden is active. health and life AG operates in the sector «Drugstore».
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 09.04.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of AG is CHE-368.651.241.
- On the same address there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: H3 Architekten AG, H3 Architektur Immobilien Holding AG, H3 Immo AG.
Management (6)
newest board members
Gerd Kaiser-Kossmayr,
Elias José Olivera,
Andreas Eichhorn,
Martial René Barbier
newest authorized signatories
Gerd Kaiser-Kossmayr,
Elias José Olivera,
Andreas Eichhorn,
Martial René Barbier,
Ludovic Jean-René Geyer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.10.2015
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Unterentfelden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.042.593-0
UID/VAT
CHE-368.651.241
Sector
Drugstore
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Vertrieb und die Herstellung von Produkten im Bereich Gesundheit und gesunder Lebensführung, damit im Zusammenhang stehende Beratung, mediale Verbreitung von Fachartikeln sowie Erbringung weiterer Dienstleistungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | 17.07.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Intercontrol AG | Zürich | 03.11.2015 | 16.07.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
InterDrogerie | 05.09.2019 | active | 02477/2019 |
Newest SOGC notifications: health and life AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006004532, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
health and life AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-368.651.241, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2023, Publ. 1005797114).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kaiser-Kossmayr, Gerd, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wettswil am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005797114, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
health and life AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-368.651.241, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 50 vom 13.03.2023, Publ. 1005698948).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Intercontrol AG, in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Ernst & Young AG (CHE-105.932.265), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005698948, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
health and life AG, in Unterentfelden, CHE-368.651.241, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 05.11.2020, Publ. 1005016018).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Strickler, Dr. Peter, von Wädenswil, in Zürich, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Birgelen, Christoph, von Zürich, in Maur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hasler, Carlo, von Zürich und Lommis, in Dietlikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Weigand, Michael, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Schwebheim (DE), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Olivera, Elias, von Ermensee, in Thun, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Barbier, Martial, von Boudry, in Hünenberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Eichhorn, Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Küttigen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Marent, Frank, von Rickenbach (ZH), in Gretzenbach, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vorsitzender der Geschäftsleitung (CEO), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Geyer, Ludovic, französischer Staatsangehöriger, in Vuisternens-devant-Romont, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien mit einem Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.