Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Reports for HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.2003
Deletion from the commercial register
14.08.2024
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Walchwil
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-270.3.013.277-7
UID/VAT
CHE-110.177.758
Sector
Operation of other financial institutions
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Beteiligung und Verwaltung von anderen Unternehmungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Finanz-, Immobilien- und andere Anlagen tätigen, Rechte erwerben, Lizenzen verwerten sowie Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tria Revisions AG | Cham | 05.08.2009 | 26.11.2018 | |
Treuhandcontor H.P. Baumann | Pratteln | <2004 | 04.08.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- HCB Happy Child Birth Holding Ltd in liquidation
- HCB Happy Child Birth Holding SA en liquidation
- HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG
- HCB Happy Child Birth Holding Ltd
- HCB Happy Child Birth AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR03-1006106296, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation, in Walchwil, CHE-110.177.758, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 226 vom 21.11.2023, Publ. 1005889804). Die Liquidation ist beendet. Die Gesellschaft wird gelöscht.
Publication number: LS01-0000045690, Commercial Registry Office Zug
Rubrik: Liquidationsschuldenrufe Unterrubrik: Liquidationsschuldenruf einer Aktiengesellschaft Publikationsdatum: SHAB 22.11.2023 Öffentlich einsehbar bis: 22.11.2028 Meldungsnummer: Im Auftrag von: HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation Liquidationsschuldenruf HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation Organisation in Auflösung: HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation CHE-110.177.758 Surenweg 7
Kontaktstelle: HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation Surenweg 7
Publication number: HR02-1005889804, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG, in Walchwil, CHE-110.177.758, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 230 vom 27.11.2018, Publ. 1004506673).
Firma neu:
HCB Happy Child Birth Holding AG in Liquidation.
Uebersetzungen der Firma neu:
(HCB Happy Child Birth Holding SA en liquidation) (HCB Happy Child Birth Holding Ltd in liquidation).
Aktien neu:
100'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00 [bisher: 100'000 vinkulierte Namenaktien zu CHF 1.00].
Vinkulierung neu:
Die statutarische Beschränkung der Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist von Gesetzes wegen aufgehoben. Die Gesellschaft ist mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 10.11.2023 aufgelöst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Althoff, Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Hagenthal Le Haut (FR), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Haring, Dr. Werner, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Lörrach (DE), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Litschgi, Prof. Dr. Mario, von Winterthur, in Schaffhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Reiser, Dr. Pedro, von St. Gallen, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wittig, Susanne, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Herrliberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schaub, Dr. Andreas F., von Diegten, in Walchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift, Liquidator, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].