Age of the company
-Turnover in CHF
-Capital in CHF
-Employees
-Active brands
-Branches (1)
Reports for Hans Vorburger AG
There is no information available because this company has been deleted.
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierCommercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.12.1990
Deletion from the commercial register
05.07.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Reinach (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.917.986-9
UID/VAT
CHE-105.824.150
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb eines Ingenieurbüros für Tief- und Hochbau, Planung und Vermessung. Die Gesellschaft kann alle Transaktionen des Mobilien- und Immobilienverkehrs vornehmen und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
TRETOR AG | Liestal | 14.04.2010 | 04.07.2010 | |
TRETOR AG Basel | Basel | <2004 | 13.04.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Vorburger Hans AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Hans Vorburger AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 5710024, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hans Vorburger AG, in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.917.986-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 71 vom 14.04.2010, S. 6, Publ. 5586260). Die Aktiven und das Fremdkapital gehen infolge Fusion auf die 'SUTTER, Ingenieur- und Planungsbüro AG', in Arboldswil (CH-280.3.916.032-5), über. Die Gesellschaft wird im Handelsregister gelöscht.
Publication number: 5586260, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hans Vorburger AG, in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.917.986-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2009, S. 7, Publ. 4854070).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Valiba Treuhand AG, in Basel (CH-270.3.005.174-5), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
TRETOR AG, in Liestal (CH-280.3.900.042-2), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 4854070, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Hans Vorburger AG, in Reinach BL, CH-280.3.917.986-9, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2005, S. 4, Publ. 2984858).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Vorburger, Hans, von St. Margrethen, in Reinach BL, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Vorburger-Stäger, Adeline, von St. Margrethen, in Reinach BL, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Vorburger, Marc, von St. Margrethen, in Biel-Benken, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sutter-Tschopp, Hans, von Arboldswil, in Flims, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sutter, Johannes, von Arboldswil, in Arboldswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Prüss, Rainer, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Bubendorf.