Reports for Hans Hächler Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Hans Hächler Holding AG
- Hans Hächler Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Baden and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Operation of investment companies».
- Hans Hächler Holding AG was founded on 04.07.1983.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 16.06.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is CHE-103.321.576.
- There are 5 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: Franz Pfister AG, Hächler AG, Hächler AG Immobilien.
Management (8)
newest board members
Joachim Lorch,
Guido Moser,
Dr. Philipp Charles Funk,
Frank Eugen Schäfer,
Christian Salz
newest authorized signatories
Joachim Lorch,
Guido Moser,
André Pierre Crelier,
Marco Andreas Emmanuello,
Dr. Philipp Charles Funk
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
04.07.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baden
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.005.157-1
UID/VAT
CHE-103.321.576
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Gesellschaften jeder Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben und alle Geschäfte betreiben, die mit dem Zweck des Unternehmens im Zusammenhang stehen oder diesen fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
thv AG | Aarau | 17.07.2018 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Aarau | 30.07.2008 | 16.07.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
KANAL TOTAL | 16.09.1999 | active | 00935/1999 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Hans Hächler Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005497359, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hans Hächler Holding AG, in Baden, CHE-103.321.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2021, Publ. 1005277453).
Statutenänderung:
07.06.2022.
Zweck neu:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Erwerb und die Verwaltung von Beteiligungen an anderen Gesellschaften jeder Art. Die Gesellschaft kann Liegenschaften erwerben und alle Geschäfte betreiben, die mit dem Zweck des Unternehmens im Zusammenhang stehen oder diesen fördern.
Aktien neu:
500 Namenaktien zu CHF 2'000.00 [bisher: 1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 (Stimmrechtsaktien) und 450 Namenaktien zu CHF 2'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief oder elektronische Post rechtsgültig an die letzte der Gesellschaft gemeldete Adresse.
Publication number: HR02-1005277453, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2021, publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 10'129 vom 11.08.2021 Hans Hächler Holding AG, in Baden, CHE-103.321.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 157 vom 16.08.2021, Publ. 1005271651).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Knecht, Fritz, von Mellikon und Baden, in Kaisten, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [nicht: Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005271651, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
Hans Hächler Holding AG, in Baden, CHE-103.321.576, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 136 vom 17.07.2018, Publ. 4363679).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lorch, Joachim, von Killwangen, in Killwangen, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.