Branches (1)
Reports for Härterei Schmid AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Härterei Schmid AG
- Härterei Schmid AG has its legal headquarters in Dulliken and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Production and processing of iron and steel».
- There are 5 active persons registered in the management.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 18.04.2023.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Härterei Schmid AG is the following: CHE-110.351.275.
Management (5)
newest board members
Ernst Schönauer,
Daniel Hutter,
Dr. Remo Hutter,
Giuseppe Lamorte,
Roger Hofer
newest authorized signatories
Ernst Schönauer,
Daniel Hutter,
Dr. Remo Hutter,
Giuseppe Lamorte,
Roger Hofer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
15.12.2003
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Dulliken
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.003.687-3
UID/VAT
CHE-110.351.275
CHE-116.326.821 VAT
Sector
Production and processing of iron and steel
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Veredelung von Metallen durch technische Wärmebehandlung, Herstellung, Verarbeitung und Verkauf von sowie Handel mit technischen Produkten. Kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, Lizenzen, Patente und andere immaterielle Werte sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, verwalten, vermitteln und veräussern, ferner Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und überhaupt alle Geschäfte tätigen, die mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft zusammenhängen oder diesen zu fördern geeignet sind.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ks revisionsexperten ag | Altstätten | 18.04.2023 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ks treuhandexperten ag | Altstätten | 24.03.2021 | 17.04.2023 | |
atrevi GmbH | Härkingen | 03.03.2011 | 23.03.2021 | |
Gribi & Partner AG | Olten | <2004 | 02.03.2011 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Heribert Schmid AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Härterei Schmid AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005726256, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Härterei Schmid AG, in Dulliken, CHE-110.351.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 24.03.2021, Publ. 1005132125).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
ks treuhandexperten ag (CHE-107.285.896), in Altstätten, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ks revisionsexperten ag (CHE-445.449.976), in Altstätten, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005132125, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Härterei Schmid AG, in Dulliken, CHE-110.351.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 42 vom 02.03.2021, Publ. 1005113256).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gribi, Patrick, von Büren an der Aare, in Trimbach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
atrevi GmbH (CH-400.4.022.482-4), in Härkingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schönauer, Ernst, von Rebstein, in Rebstein, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hutter, Daniel, von Oberriet (SG), in Oberriet (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hutter, Remo, von Oberriet (SG), in Oberriet (SG), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Lamorte, Giuseppe, von Widnau, in Widnau, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
ks treuhandexperten ag (CHE-107.285.896), in Altstätten, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005113256, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Härterei Schmid AG, in Dulliken, CHE-110.351.275, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 53 vom 16.03.2011, S.0, Publ. 6077934).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der "PPJN AG", in Olten (CHE-106.930.010), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 24.02.2021 und Bilanz per 31.12.2020. Aktiven von CHF 172'722.53, unter denen sich sämtliche Aktien der übernehmenden Gesellschaft befinden, und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 22'486.59 gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Es findet keine Kapitalerhöhung statt, da die Aktionäre der übertragenden Gesellschaft die anlässlich der Fusion erworbenen eigenen Aktien der übernehmenden Gesellschaft erhalten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.