Branches (1)
Reports for GVH-BP Jura SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GVH-BP Jura SA
- GVH-BP Jura SA with its legal headquarters in Delémont is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». GVH-BP Jura SA is active.
- The management of the company GVH-BP Jura SA consists of 8 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 28.02.1990.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 13.10.2022.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company GVH-BP Jura SA is the following: CHE-106.181.389.
Management (8)
newest board members
Michel Thomann,
Dominique Paul Louis Tendon,
Sylvain Pierre André Plumey,
Didier Michel Rizzon,
Jacques Philippe Richard L'Eplattenier
newest authorized signatories
Jérôme Albert Crelier,
Michel Thomann,
Dominique Paul Louis Tendon,
Sylvain Pierre André Plumey,
Didier Michel Rizzon
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.02.1990
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Delémont
Commercial Registry Office
JU
Commercial register number
CH-670.3.000.711-4
UID/VAT
CHE-106.181.389
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un bureau d'ingénieurs civils (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Cabinet d'audit Leitenberg & Associés SA | Neuchâtel | 17.01.2020 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
FDA Fiduciaire S.A. | Val-de-Ruz | 08.01.2013 | 16.01.2020 | |
Fénart Eric - FIREC | La Chaux-de-Fonds | 25.11.2009 | 07.01.2013 | |
Firec SA | La Chaux-de-Fonds | <2004 | 24.11.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- GVH Delémont S.A.
- GVH Delémont SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GVH-BP Jura SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005583051, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
GVH-BP Jura SA, à Delémont, CHE-106.181.389, société anonyme (No. FOSC 44 du 03.03.2022, Publ. 1005419641).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Tendon, Dominique Paul Louis, de Haute-Sorne, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, membre et secrétaire du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Saignelégier].
Publication number: HR02-1005419641, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
GVH-BP Jura SA, à Delémont, CHE-106.181.389, société anonyme (No. FOSC 230 du 25.11.2020, Publ. 1005031907).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Crelier, Jérôme Albert, de Bure, à Alle, directeur adjoint, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005031907, Commercial Registry Office Jura, (670)
GVH-BP Jura SA, à Delémont, CHE-106.181.389, société anonyme (No. FOSC 11 du 17.01.2020, Publ. 1004808392).
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Thomann, Michel, de St. Gallen, à La Chaux-de-Fonds, membre du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.