Reports for GRISARD Immobilien AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GRISARD Immobilien AG
- GRISARD Immobilien AG with its legal headquarters in Suhr is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». GRISARD Immobilien AG is active.
- The management of the company GRISARD Immobilien AG consists of 5 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 11.10.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-100.710.740.
- There are 20 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Aare Mittelland Immo AG, Bau Immo Pool AG, e-fuels2go AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Jean-Pierre Méroz,
Thomas Hochuli,
Nora El Kamel,
Ramon Beat Werner,
Konrad Duttwiler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.08.1961
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Suhr
Commercial Registry Office
AG
Commercial register number
CH-400.3.915.108-4
UID/VAT
CHE-100.710.740
CHE-225.845.090 VAT
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten, Verwalten und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften; kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten, sich bei anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder errichten, Vertretungen übernehmen sowie Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern oder verwalten.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Basel | <2004 | 07.03.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GRISARD Immobilien AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005309587, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
GRISARD Immobilien AG, in Suhr, CHE-100.710.740, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2021, Publ. 1005275819).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zubler, Martina, von Aarau, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005275819, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
GRISARD Immobilien AG, in Suhr, CHE-100.710.740, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 220 vom 11.11.2020, Publ. 1005020377).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Méroz, Jean-Pierre, von Sonvilier, in Hunzenschwil, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005020377, Commercial Registry Office Aargau, (400)
GRISARD Immobilien AG, in Suhr, CHE-100.710.740, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 30.06.2020, Publ. 1004924302).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wyss, Laurent, von Bottmingen, in Bottmingen, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hochuli, Thomas, von Reitnau, in Aarau, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zubler, Martina, von Aarau, in Zürich, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.