Reports for Gribes Services AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gribes Services AG
- Gribes Services AG with its legal headquarters in Ostermundigen is active. Gribes Services AG operates in the sector «Business management and administration».
- Gribes Services AG was founded on 12.04.2011.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 01.09.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-489.160.251.
- Companies with an identical address: AG Büro 70, GFAG Holding AG, Gribes Properties AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.04.2011
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ostermundigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.3.050.518-3
UID/VAT
CHE-489.160.251
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erbringen von Managementleistungen für Firmen der GFAG Holding AG sowie für Dritte. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Gribes Services Ltd
- Gribes Services SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gribes Services AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3727701, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gribes Services AG, in Ostermundigen, CHE-489.160.251, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 15.04.2011, Publ. 6125012).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Studer, Thomas, von Grafenried, in Münsingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 6125012, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gribes Services AG (Gribes Services SA) (Gribes Services Ltd), in Ostermundigen, CH-036.3.050.518-3, Gerbestrasse 12, 3072 Ostermundigen, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
11.04.2011.
Zweck:
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist das Erbringen von Managementleistungen für Firmen der GFAG Holding AG sowie für Dritte. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben oder weiterveräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
1'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB.
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre:
schriftlich.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 11.04.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Schürch, Roland, von Sumiswald, in Worb, Präsident, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Bernhard, Andreas, von Seeberg, in Bolligen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Grisenti, Marcel, von Trub, in Worb, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Studer, Thomas, von Grafenried, in Münsingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.