Reports for Graf + Cie AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Graf + Cie AG
- Graf + Cie AG is currently active and the industry «Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof». The legal headquarters are in Rapperswil SG.
- Graf + Cie AG has 12 persons entered in its management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 24.05.2023.
- In the commercial register the company Graf + Cie AG is registered under the UID CHE-101.214.395.
- In the IPI there are 11 trademarks or applications registered by the company Graf + Cie AG.
Management (12)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Daniel Eberhard,
Thierry Jacobs,
Marco Michael Zappa,
Giuseppe Lombardo,
Christian Dratva
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
01.01.1917
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rapperswil-Jona
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.003.011-1
UID/VAT
CHE-101.214.395
Sector
Manufacturing of other machinery and parts thereof
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung und den Vertrieb von Kratzen und anderen der Spinnerei-Industrie dienenden Zubehör, Geräten und Einrichtungen aller Art. Die Gesellschaft kann alle mit ihrem Zweck oder der Anlage ihrer Mittel direkt oder indirekt in Verbindung stehenden Geschäfte vornehmen, ihre Tätigkeit auf andere Branchen ausdehnen, Grundstücke erwerben, veräussern und verwalten und Unternehmen im In- und Ausland erwerben oder sich daran beteiligen. Sie kann überdies anderen Gruppengesellschaften des Rieter-Konzerns Darlehen oder andere Finanzierungen gewähren und für Verbindlichkeiten von solchen Gruppengesellschaften Sicherheiten aller Art stellen, einschliesslich mittels Pfandrechten an oder fiduziarischen Übereignungen von Aktiven der Gesellschaft oder Garantien jedwelcher Art.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KPMG AG | Zürich | 24.05.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | <2004 | 23.05.2023 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Graf & Cie AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
Graf | 12.06.2012 | active | 53983/2012 |
Hipro | 16.05.2012 | active | 53671/2012 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Graf + Cie AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005752859, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Graf + Cie AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-101.214.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 13.06.2022, Publ. 1005493899).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Anwander, Thomas Martin, von Winterthur, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG (CHE-106.839.438), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Eberhard, Daniel, von Zürich, in Neuwilen (Kemmental), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
KPMG AG (CHE-106.084.881), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005493899, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Graf + Cie AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-101.214.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 128 vom 06.07.2021, Publ. 1005240683).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rosati, Cristian, von Wädenswil, in Nänikon (Uster), Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Wädenswil].
Publication number: HR02-1005240683, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Graf + Cie AG, in Rapperswil-Jona, CHE-101.214.395, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 52 vom 16.03.2021, Publ. 1005125095).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jacobs, Thierry, von Langenthal, in Zürich, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.