Reports for goldenwings GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout goldenwings GmbH
- goldenwings GmbH with its legal headquarters in Giswil is a Limited liability company from the sector «Other transportation services». goldenwings GmbH is active.
- The management of the company goldenwings GmbH consists of 2 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 21.12.2017.
- The last commercial register change was made on 01.11.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the company goldenwings GmbH is registered under the UID CHE-137.844.553.
- Companies with an identical address: DOMITIOR AG, Hotel Krone Giswil AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2017
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Giswil
Commercial Registry Office
OW
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.083.491-2
UID/VAT
CHE-137.844.553
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erbringen von Touristikdienstleistungen, insbesondere Organisation und Vermittlung von allen Dienstleistungen des Personenreise- und Warenverkehrs im In- und Ausland sowie Erbringung sämtlicher mit der Aviatik zusammenhängenden Dienstleistungen, insbesondere Dienstleistungen im Bereich Charterflüge. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen in der Schweiz und im Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und des Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann Grundstücke, Immaterialgüterrechte und Lizenzen aller Art erwerben, verwalten, belasten und veräussern.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- goldenwings Sàrl
- goldenwings Ltd liab. Co
- goldenwings Sagl
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: goldenwings GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005873867, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
goldenwings GmbH, in Giswil, CHE-137.844.553, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 11 vom 17.01.2023, Publ. 1005653918).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
DOMITIOR AG (CHE-479.562.665), in Zug, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hotel Krone Giswil AG (CHE-111.734.963), in Giswil, Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1005654185, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
goldenwings GmbH, in Wil (SG), CHE-137.844.553, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2022, Publ. 1005562292). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Giswil im Handelsregister des Kantons Obwalden eingetragen und im Handelsregister Kanton St. Gallen von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: HR02-1005653918, Commercial Registry Office Obwalden, (140)
goldenwings GmbH, bisher in Wil (SG), CHE-137.844.553, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2022, Publ. 1005562292).
Statutenänderung:
06.01.2023.
Sitz neu:
Giswil.
Domizil neu:
Brünigstrasse 92, 6074 Giswil. Nicht publikationspflichtige weitere Statutenänderungen.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Jeger Susmani, Dorothea, von Breitenbach, in Giswil, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Adelboden].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.