Address
Route des Châtaigniers 13
1816 Chailly-Montreux
Branches (3)
Reports for Giovanna Holding SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Giovanna Holding SA
- Giovanna Holding SA from Chailly-Montreux operates in the sector «Business management and administration» and is active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 12.06.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the company Giovanna Holding SA is registered under the UID CHE-105.735.569.
Management (4)
newest board members
Jacques Gabriel Berger,
Laurent Charles Berney,
Philippe Ciocca
newest authorized signatories
Jacques Gabriel Berger,
Laurent Charles Berney,
Jean-Gabriel Hardt,
Philippe Ciocca
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.1912
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Montreux
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.098.712-0
UID/VAT
CHE-105.735.569
CHE-116.329.564 VAT
Sector
Business management and administration
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Gestion, financement, acquisition et vente de diverses participations.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO SA | Epalinges | 12.06.2024 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers SA | Pully | 20.06.2001 | 11.06.2024 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- H. Giovanna SA
- H. Giovanna S.A.
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Giovanna Holding SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006055272, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Giovanna Holding SA, à Montreux, CHE-105.735.569 (FOSC du 21.12.2021, p. 0/1005363397). Hofer Jérôme n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. PricewaterhouseCoopers SA n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
BDO SA (CHE-347.141.454), à Epalinges.
Publication number: HR02-1005363397, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Giovanna Holding SA, à Montreux, CHE-105.735.569 (FOSC du 30.09.2021, p. 0/1005302317). Berger Jacques, de Grosshöchstetten, à Morges, avec signature collective à deux, et Berney Laurent, de Collex-Bossy, à Collonge-Bellerive, avec signature collective à deux sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1005302317, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Giovanna Holding SA, à Montreux, CHE-105.735.569 (FOSC du 03.08.2021, p. 0/1005263805). La signature de Zwahlen Martin est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.