Reports for Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten
- Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten is active in the industry «Management of real estate portfolio properties» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Grosshöchstetten.
- The management of the company Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten consists of 4 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 19.04.2021.
- The reported UID is CHE-105.931.509.
- Dach und Stein Reinigung Inh. A. Kwiek, Hans-Gerber-Stiftung are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest board members
Frank Adrian Gerber,
Pascal Chevalier,
Mark Ulrich Gerber,
Markus Gerber
newest authorized signatories
Frank Adrian Gerber,
Pascal Chevalier,
Mark Ulrich Gerber,
Markus Gerber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
11.09.1920
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grosshöchstetten
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.3.008.834-6
UID/VAT
CHE-105.931.509
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Verwaltung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundstücken sowie Beteiligungen an solchen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche erwerben, Vertretungen übernehmen, sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum, Wertschriften und Immaterialgüter aller Art belasten, veräussern und verwalten..
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
RZ TREUHAND Pascal Chevalier | Köniz | 04.09.2008 | 29.06.2015 | |
Ernst & Young AG | Bern | <2004 | 03.09.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Chr. Gerber Söhne AG, Fleischprodukte
- Gerber Chr. Söhne AG, Fleischprodukte
- Gerber Chr. Söhne AG Grossmetzgerei
- Gerber Chr. Söhne AG Fleischprodukte
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005152295, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten, in Grosshöchstetten, CHE-105.931.509, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 7 vom 11.01.2019, Publ. 1004538981).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Trösch, Urs, von Thunstetten, in Grosshöchstetten, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Frank Adrian, von Langnau im Emmental, in Ersigen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1004538981, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten, in Grosshöchstetten, CHE-105.931.509, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 123 vom 30.06.2015, Publ. 2237925).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maurer, Walter, von Zollikofen, in Uttigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gerber, Markus, von Langnau im Emmental, in Grosshöchstetten, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Trösch, Urs, von Thunstetten, in Grosshöchstetten, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Gerber, Mark Ulrich, von Langnau im Emmental, in Grosshöchstetten, Mitglied und Sekretär des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Sekretär, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien, ohne Angabe zur Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Chevalier, Pascal, von Moutier, in Innerberg (Wohlen bei Bern), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gerber, Frank Adrian, von Langnau im Emmental, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 2237925, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Gerber Immobilien AG Grosshöchstetten, in Grosshöchstetten, CHE-105.931.509, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 175 vom 11.09.2014, Publ. 1709191).
Statutenänderung:
22.06.2015.
Zweck neu:
Verwaltung, Erwerb und Veräusserung von Grundstücken sowie Beteiligungen an solchen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland beteiligen oder solche erwerben, Vertretungen übernehmen, sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundeigentum, Wertschriften und Immaterialgüter aller Art belasten, veräussern und verwalten..
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: mit Brief, Fax oder elektronischer Post. Gemäss Erklärung vom 22.06.2015 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
RZ TREUHAND Pascal Chevalier (CHE-102.299.767), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.