Address
Route de la Parqueterie 23
1635 La Tour-de-Trême
Reports for Gérard Dupré
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gérard Dupré
- Gérard Dupré is a Sole proprietorship with its legal headquarters in La Tour-de-Trême. Gérard Dupré belongs to the industry «Locksmithery, smithy and workshops» and is currently active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 29.05.1986.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 13.06.2022.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of FR is CHE-106.496.410.
- On the same address there are 2 other active companies registered. These include: Palor S.A., Wild Mountain Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.05.1986
Legal form
Sole proprietorship
Legal headquarters of the company
Bulle
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.0.410.927-8
UID/VAT
CHE-106.496.410
Sector
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Atelier de mécanique générale
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Dupré Gérard
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gérard Dupré
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005493719, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Gérard Dupré, à Sâles, CHE-106.496.410 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225826). Siège transféré à Bulle.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de la Parqueterie 23, 1635 La Tour-de-Trême.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Dupré et Yerly, à Sâles , exploitation d'un atelier de mécanique, société en nom collectif (FOSC du 29.5.1986, no121, p.2079). La société est dissoute depuis le 30 juin 1989. La liquidation étant terminée, cette raison sociale est radiée. L'actif et le passif sont repris par l'associé Gérard Dupré, à Sâles, ci-après inscrit.
Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
Gérard Dupré, à Sâles . Le chef de la maison est GérardDupré, de Gruyères, à Pringy. La maison reprend l'actif et le passif de la société en nom collectif "Dupré et Yerly", à Sâles, radiée. Atelier de mécanique.
Adresse:
1625 Sâles.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.