Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung Brig-Glis
Ueberlandstrasse 60
3902 Glis
Reports for Geothermie Brig-Glis AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Geothermie Brig-Glis AG
- Geothermie Brig-Glis AG with its legal headquarters in Glis is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Architectural and engineering activities». Geothermie Brig-Glis AG is active.
- The company was founded on 27.01.2009.
- On the 23.05.2022 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Geothermie Brig-Glis AG is the following: CHE-114.691.646.
Management (7)
newest board members
Mathias Bellwald,
Diego Pirmin Pfammatter,
Bruno Albert Bass,
Dr. Hans Peter Burgener,
Frédérique Emile André Antoine Zuber
newest authorized signatories
Mathias Bellwald,
Urs Renato Studer,
Diego Pirmin Pfammatter,
Bruno Albert Bass,
Dr. Hans Peter Burgener
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.01.2009
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Brig-Glis
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.3.013.638-1
UID/VAT
CHE-114.691.646
Sector
Architectural and engineering activities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Durchführung von Geothermiebohrungen auf Gebiet der Gemeinde Brig-Glis sowie die Planung, den Bau und den Betrieb von Geothermiekraftwerken zur Nutzung und Vermarktung von Energie aus Wasser und Wärme. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck beteiligen; sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Geothermie Brigerbad AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Geothermie Brig-Glis AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005480276, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Geothermie Brig-Glis AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.691.646, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 225 vom 20.11.2017, Publ. 3879889).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schmidhalter, Karl, von Brig-Glis, in Brig-Glis, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brogli, Eduard Vittorio, von Brig-Glis, in Brig (Brig-Glis), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bellwald, Mathias, von Kippel, in Brig (Brig-Glis), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Studer, Urs Renato, von Visperterminen, in Visp, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3879889, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Geothermie Brig-Glis AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.691.646, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 228 vom 25.11.2013, Publ. 1198385).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kreuzer, Alexander, genannt Alex, von Obergoms, in Visp, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wyss, Björn, von Brienz (BE), in Ried-Brig, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Pfammatter, Diego Pirmin, von Eggerberg, in Brig (Brig-Glis), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Brogli, Eduard Vittorio, von Brig-Glis, in Brig (Brig-Glis), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: 1198385, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Geothermie Brigerbad AG, in Brig-Glis, CHE-114.691.646, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 86 vom 06.05.2013, Publ. 7178192).
Statutenänderung:
15.11.2013.
Firma neu:
Geothermie Brig-Glis AG.
Domizil neu:
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung Brig-Glis, Überlandstrasse 60, 3902 Glis.
Zweck neu:
Durchführung von Geothermiebohrungen auf Gebiet der Gemeinde Brig-Glis sowie die Planung, den Bau und den Betrieb von Geothermiekraftwerken zur Nutzung und Vermarktung von Energie aus Wasser und Wärme. Die Gesellschaft kann sich an Unternehmungen mit gleichem oder ähnlichem Zweck beteiligen;
sie kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten.
Publikationsorgan neu:
SHAB. [Die übrigen Änderungen betreffen die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen nicht.].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.