Address
c/o Hans Ritz
Bellwalderstrasse 448
3997 Bellwald
Reports for Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald
- Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald is a Cooperative with its legal headquarters in Bellwald. Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- The organization was founded on 16.07.1976.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 12.10.2021.
- The organization Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald is registered under the UID CHE-101.918.266.
- Hotel Relief AG, Ritz Immobilien AG, Ritz Verwaltung und Vermietung GmbH have the same address as Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald.
Management (10)
newest members of the administration
Martin Perren-Zufferey,
Romeo Volken,
Roland Odermatt,
Claudio Della Bianca,
Michael Albert Wyden
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.1976
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Bellwald
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.5.000.232-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.918.266
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung des Baues und des Betriebes aller Art von Ferieneinrichtungen. Beteiligung an Unternehmungen, welche diesem Zweck dienliche Anlagen oder Einrichtungen erstellen oder betrieben. Zusammenarbeit mit allen sich für die touristische Entwicklung von Bellwald einsetzenden Bestrebungen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
APROA AG | Visp | 24.06.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG | Fiesch | 15.09.2011 | 23.06.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005310868, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald, in Bellwald, CHE-101.918.266, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2020, Publ. 1004979237).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lambrigger, Georg, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Holzer, Marco, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Perren-Zufferey, Martin, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Volken, Romeo, von Fiesch, in Bellwald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004979237, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald, in Bellwald, CHE-101.918.266, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 132 vom 10.07.2020, Publ. 1004934660).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wenger, Johann, genannt Hans, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bittel, Reinhard, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wolf, Eugen, von Zeiningen, in Bellwald, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Odermatt, Roland Hans, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied und Sekretär der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Della Bianca, Claudio, von Brig-Glis, in Bellwald, Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Wyden, Michael Albert, von Bellwald, in Fürgangen (Bellwald), Mitglied der Verwaltung, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004934660, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Genossenschaft zur Förderung der touristischen Infrastruktur in Bellwald, in Bellwald, CHE-101.918.266, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 24.06.2015, S.0, Publ. 2226443).
Domizil neu:
c/o Hans Ritz, Bellwalderstrasse 448, 3997 Bellwald.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.