Reports for Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH
- Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH has its legal headquarters in Basel and is active. It operates in the sector «Sport services».
- The management consists of 4 persons. The organization was founded on 14.02.1995.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 18.09.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-108.219.502.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Kaja Mustavar,
Shannyn Oser,
Fabio Cersosimo,
Norbert Pernhag
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Kaja Mustavar,
Shannyn Oser,
Fabio Cersosimo,
Norbert Pernhag
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
14.02.1995
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.5.000.098-4
UID/VAT
CHE-108.219.502
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
In gemeinsamer Selbsthilfe Errichtung und Betrieb einer Rollschuh-Sport-Halle.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Liestal | 31.05.2010 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Aviso Treuhand AG | Basel | 22.10.2009 | 30.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006132370, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH, in Basel, CHE-108.219.502, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 05.06.2023, Publ. 1005760143).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: c/o Dursum Besic, Hasenrainstrasse 14a, 4102 Binningen]. [gestrichen: c/o Peter Mohler-Hodel, Ergolzstrasse 142, 4414 Füllinsdorf]. c/o Kaja Mustavar, Baslerstrasse 343, 4123 Allschwil.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Besic, Dursum, von Moosseedorf, in Binningen, Präsident der Verwaltung, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jäger, Lara, von Basel, in Basel, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mustavar, Kaja, von Basel, in Allschwil, Präsidentin der Verwaltung, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Oser, Shannyn, von Hofstetten-Flüh, in Folgensbourg (FR), Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
BDO AG (CHE-370.772.724), in Liestal, Revisionsstelle [bisher: BDO AG (CH-280.9.917.020-3/)].
Publication number: HR02-1005760143, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH, in Basel, CHE-108.219.502, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2021, Publ. 1005301118).
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Dursum Besic, Hasenrainstrasse 14a, 4102 Binningen.
Publication number: HR02-1005301118, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rollschuh-Sport-Halle RSH, in Basel, CHE-108.219.502, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 120 vom 25.06.2013, S.0, Publ. 937005).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Mohler, Peter, von Frenkendorf und Thürnen, in Füllinsdorf, Präsident der Verwaltung, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frei, Hanspeter, von Basel, in Allschwil, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mohler, Max, von Thürnen, in Frenkendorf, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Kassier, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Mustavar, Ales, von Basel, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Besic, Dursum, von Moosseedorf, in Binningen, Präsident der Verwaltung, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Jäger, Lara, von Basel, in Basel, Vizepräsidentin der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Cersosimo, Fabio, von Guggisberg, in Bottmingen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Pernhag, Norbert, von Allschwil, in Allschwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Mustavar, Kaja, von Basel, in Allschwil, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.