Address
c/o André S. Berne bei Wenger Plattner
Aeschenvorstadt 55
4051 Basel
Reports for Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller
- Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller has its legal headquarters in Basel, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- There are 4 active persons registered in the management.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 04.09.2024.
- Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller is registered in the Canton of BS under the UID CHE-100.048.616.
- There are 23 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Aedificura AG, Alpha MET AG, BOO 3 GmbH.
Management (4)
newest members of the administration
Patrick Simon Huber,
Marco Lussi,
Dr. Elias Sebastian Imahorn,
Raphael Imahorn
newest authorized signatories
Patrick Simon Huber,
Marco Lussi,
Dr. Elias Sebastian Imahorn,
Raphael Imahorn
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
26.05.1976
Legal form
Cooperative
Legal headquarters of the company
Basel
Commercial Registry Office
BS
Commercial register number
CH-270.5.000.132-3
UID/VAT
CHE-100.048.616
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb und Verwaltung eines Kellers zur Benützung durch die Studenten-Verbindung Rauracia und Alt-Rauracia.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006121575, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller, in Basel, CHE-100.048.616, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 166 vom 27.08.2021, Publ. 1005279141).
Domizil neu:
c/o André S. Berne bei Wenger Plattner, Aeschenvorstadt 55, 4051 Basel.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Berne, André Steffen, von Milvignes, in Basel, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Frischknecht, Fabian, von Schwellbrunn, in Zürich, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Simonett, Michael, von Medel (Lucmagn), in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lussi, Marco, von Winterthur, in Riehen, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Huber, Patrick Simon, von Basel, in Riehen, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Imahorn, Dr. Elias Sebastian, von Obergoms, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Imahorn, Raphael, von Obergoms, in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005279141, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller, in Basel, CHE-100.048.616, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 72 vom 12.04.2019, Publ. 1004609620).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Heck, Heiko, von Märstetten, in Hofstetten-Flüh, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Berne, André Steffen, von Milvignes, in Basel, Präsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Milvignes, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Imahorn, Dr. Elias Sebastian, von Obergoms, in Basel, Vizepräsident der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004609620, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Stadt, (270)
Genossenschaft Rauracherkeller, in Basel, CHE-100.048.616, Genossenschaft (SHAB Nr. 133 vom 12.07.2018, Publ. 4354253).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hasler, Dr. phil. II Lorenz, von Walkringen, in Riehen, Mitglied der Verwaltung, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Simonett, Michael, von Medel (Lucmagn), in Basel, Mitglied der Verwaltung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.