Reports for Gebrüder Nötzli AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gebrüder Nötzli AG
- Gebrüder Nötzli AG is active in the industry «General structural engineering» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Zürich.
- The company was founded on 06.02.1980 and has 3 persons in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.11.2020.
- Gebrüder Nötzli AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-107.958.040.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
06.02.1980
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.910.191-6
UID/VAT
CHE-107.958.040
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Ausführung von Bauaufträgen und Renovationsarbeiten sowie Übernahme von Generalunternehmeraufträgen; kann sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG | Zürich | 27.08.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KBT Revisions AG | Zürich | 01.12.2014 | 26.08.2019 | |
HAROW AG in Liquidation | Baar | 28.12.2009 | 30.11.2014 | |
CTC Codex Treuhand und Consulting AG | Zürich | <2004 | 27.12.2009 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Nötzli Gebrüder AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gebrüder Nötzli AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005022994, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gebrüder Nötzli AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.958.040, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 27.08.2019, Publ. 1004702976).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nötzli, Walter, von Oetwil an der Limmat, in Thalwil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Adliswil];
Nötzli, Anja, von Oetwil an der Limmat, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Adliswil];
Nötzli, Sarah, von Oetwil an der Limmat, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Adliswil].
Publication number: HR02-1004702976, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gebrüder Nötzli AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.958.040, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 124 vom 29.06.2016, S.0, Publ. 2921233).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
KBT Revisions AG (CHE-102.663.608), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Balmer-Etienne AG (CHE-258.485.259), in Zürich, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2921233, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Gebrüder Nötzli AG, in Zürich, CHE-107.958.040, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 232 vom 01.12.2014, Publ. 1851173).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Pesavento, Leonardo E., von Zürich, in Langnau am Albis, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Pesavento, Jolanda, von Adliswil und Zürich, in Langnau am Albis, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Nötzli, Walter, von Oetwil an der Limmat, in Adliswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer mit Einzelunterschrift];
Nötzli, Anja, von Oetwil an der Limmat, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.