Reports for Gebrüder Läubli AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Gebrüder Läubli AG
- Gebrüder Läubli AG has its legal headquarters in Ermatingen, is active and operates in the sector «Trading in food products».
- The management of the company Gebrüder Läubli AG, which was founded on the 18.05.1983, consists of 2 persons.
- On the 21.05.2019 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the company Gebrüder Läubli AG is registered under the UID CHE-100.132.240.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.05.1983
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Ermatingen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.3.004.887-9
UID/VAT
CHE-100.132.240
Sector
Trading in food products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Fischen, Wild und Geflügel.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Romag Treuhand AG | Romanshorn | 21.05.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Sidler Treuhand AG | Romanshorn | <2004 | 20.05.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Läubli Gebrüder AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Gebrüder Läubli AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004634922, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Gebrüder Läubli A.G., in Ermatingen, CHE-100.132.240, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 176 vom 12.09.2001, S.7109).
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Sidler Treuhand AG, Alleestrasse 20, 8590 Romanshorn.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Merz-Läubli, Dr. Rudolf, von Zürich und Murten, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Sidler Treuhand AG, in Kreuzlingen, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Romag Treuhand AG (CHE-107.964.773), in Romanshorn, Revisionsstelle.
Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2001, S. 6744, publizierten TB-Eintrag Nr. 3394 vom 27.08.2001. Gebrüder Läubli A.G., in Ermatingen, Handel mit Fischen, Wild und Geflügel, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2001, S. 6744).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Amsler, Albert, von Densbüren, in Ermatingen, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Merz, Peter, von Zürich und Murten, in Zürich, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Männedorf];
Merz-Läubli, Dr. Rudolf, von Zürich und Murten, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: von Murten].
Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Gebrüder Läubli A.G., in Ermatingen, Handel mit Fischen, Wild und Geflügel, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 28.04.1983, S. 1425).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Merz-Läubli, Isabella, von Murten und Zürich, in Zürich, Delegierte, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Merz, Peter, von Zürich und Murten, in Männedorf, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Merz, Rudolf, von Zürich und Murten, in Zürich, Vizepräsident, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Merz-Läubli, Dr. Rudolf, von Murten, in Zürich, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident];
Sidler Treuhand AG, in Kreuzlingen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.