Reports for GDK Motos Sàrl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout GDK Motos Sàrl
- GDK Motos Sàrl in Gland is a Limited liability company from the sector «Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles». GDK Motos Sàrl is active.
- GDK Motos Sàrl was founded on 16.07.2012.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 27.09.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- GDK Motos Sàrl is registered in the Canton of VD under the UID CHE-396.261.945.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.07.2012
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Gland
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.107.864-2
UID/VAT
CHE-396.261.945
Sector
Dealing and repair of automobiles and motorcycles
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La société a pour but la vente, la réparation et l'entretien de motos, power-products, machines de jardin et moteurs de bateaux (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: GDK Motos Sàrl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005847140, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GDK Motos Sàrl, à Gland, CHE-396.261.945 (FOSC du 15.08.2017, p. 0/3697879). Buclin Vincent, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 250 parts de CHF 100 à Küffer Gilles, désormais à Burtigny, qui n'est plus président, maintenant titulaire de 500 parts de CHF 100.
Publication number: 3697879, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GDK Motos Sàrl, à Gland, CHE-396.261.945 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Kuffer Didier, qui n'est plus associé-gérant et dont la signature est radiée, cède ses 500 parts de CHF 100, par 250 parts à Küffer Gilles, d'Ins, à Gingins, président, et par 250 parts de CHF 100 à Buclin Vincent, d'Etoy, à Gland, secrétaire, tous deux nouveaux associés-gérants avec signature individuelle.
Publication number: 6777428, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
GDK Motos Sàrl, à Gland, chemin du Riant-Coteau 17, 1196 Gland, CH-550-1107864-2. Nouvelle société à responsabilité limitée.
Statuts:
26 juin 2012.
But:
la société a pour but la vente, la réparation et l'entretien de motos, power-products, machines de jardin et moteurs de bateaux (pour but complet cf. statuts).
Obligation de fournir des prestations accessoires, droits de préférence, de préemption ou d'emption:
pour les détails, voir les statuts.
Capital social:
CHF 50'000. Apport en nature et reprise de biens selon contrat du 26 juin 2012: actifs (CHF 167'026.78) et passifs (CHF 106'412.97) de l'entreprise individuelle GDK Motos, Garage Didier Kuffer (CH-550-0001561-6), à Gland, soit un actif net de CHF 60'613.81;
en contrepartie, il est remis 500 parts sociales de CHF 100, le solde de CHF 10'613.81 constituant une créance de l'apporteur contre la société.
Associé-gérant avec signature individuelle:
Kuffer Didier, d'Ins, à Signy-Avenex, avec 500 parts de CHF 100.
Organe de publication:
Feuille officielle suisse du commerce.
Communications aux associés:
par écrit ou par courrier électronique. Selon déclaration du 26 juin 2012, la société n'est pas soumise à une révision ordinaire et renonce à une révision restreinte.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.